Berben v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Edwin J. Berben
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2021cv00663
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bonventre on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Bonventre, John)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(map)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Bonventre, John)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Notice with General Order served on National Railroad Passenger Corporation D/B/A Amtrak on 06/15/2021, filed by Edwin J. Berben. (Coffey, Stephen)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Revised Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (map)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Edwin J. Berben is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Coffey, Stephen)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 9/7/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/31/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (map)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5547820) filed by Edwin J. Berben. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berben v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: John A. Bonventre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin J. Berben
Represented By: Stephen R. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?