Bentley v. LePage Bakeries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jared Bentley
Defendant: Ambassador Personnel, Inc. and LePage Bakeries Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00672
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit: Clerk added "Re: Ambassador Personnel, Inc." to the Dkt. No. #4 Docket Entry and added "Re: LePage Bakeries Inc." to the Dkt. No. #5 Docket Entry. (hmr)
July 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Re; LePage Bakeries Inc. by Jared Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Receipt, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Sorsby, Patrick) Modified on 7/22/2021 (hmr).
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Re: Ambassador Personnel, Inc. by Jared Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Receipt, #2 Exhibit(s) waiver of service)(Sorsby, Patrick) Modified on 7/22/2021 (hmr).
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/1/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Ambassador Personnel, Inc., LePage Bakeries Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Ambassador Personnel, Inc.)(hmr)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ambassador Personnel, Inc., LePage Bakeries Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5547356) filed by Jared Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. LePage Bakeries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Bentley
Represented By: Patrick Sorsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambassador Personnel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LePage Bakeries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?