Great Northern Insurance Company v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: ADT LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00685
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
2 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Filing 44 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Mitchell J. Katz has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Michael S. Munger and Erin M. Fishman. Dated: July 29, 2022(Iemma, Joseph)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2022. Discovery due by 4/21/2023. Motions to be filed by 6/21/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/21/2023. Status Report due by 12/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/28/2022. (tab)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 7/26/2022. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/28/2022. (tab)
June 21, 2022 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/21/2022 by telephone. Appearances by Michael Munger, Esq. for plaintiff; Erin Fishman, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. Plaintiff to file a jury demand, unopposed. [10:30am-10:35am] (tab)
June 14, 2022 Filing 41 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Munger, Michael)
June 9, 2022 Filing 40 COURT NOTICE of Change in Conference (Time only): Due to a conflcit in the Court's calendar, the Initial Conference that is set for Tuesday, 6/21/2022 is reset to begin at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel.(originally scheduled for 10:00 am) The conference will be conducted by telephone and counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. (tab)
May 11, 2022 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by ADT LLC.(Iemma, Joseph)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Letter Motion from Joseph A. Iemma, Esq. for ADT LLC requesting Second Extension of Time to Answer : ADT LLC answer deadline is extended and is now due 5/16/2022. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/14/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is reset for 6/21/2022 @ 10:00 AM. The conference will be conducted by telephone and counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/29/2022. (tab)
April 27, 2022 Filing 37 Letter Motion from Joseph A. Iemma, Esq. for ADT LLC requesting Second Extension of Time to Answer submitted to Judge Hon. Brenda K. Sannes . (Iemma, Joseph)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Letter Motion from Joseph Iemma, Esq. for ADT LLC requesting Extension of Time to Answer : ADT LLC answer due 5/2/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/15/2022. (tab)
April 13, 2022 Filing 35 Letter Motion from Joseph Iemma, Esq. for ADT LLC requesting Extension of Time to Answer submitted to Judge Hon. Brenda K. Sannes . (Iemma, Joseph)
April 7, 2022 Filing 34 COURT NOTICE of Hearing: The Initial Conference has been set for 5/16/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/9/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone and counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. [Reset Deadlines: Answer deadline for ADT LLC is 4/18/2022](tab)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #6 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' negligence claim and gross negligence claim (Counts 1 and 3). It is further ORDERED that the motion is otherwise DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's negligence and gross negligence claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a letter motion seeking permission to amend, as set forth above, by April 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/21/2022. (nmk)
January 4, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE by ADT LLC Withdrawal of Attorney (Kane, Jordan)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brenda K. Sannes for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/20/2021. (khr)
July 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan A Kane on behalf of ADT LLC (Kane, Jordan)
July 26, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Robert Scott on behalf of ADT LLC (Scott, Jason)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Kane, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/22/2021. (tab)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Scott, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/22/2021. (tab)
July 21, 2021 Filing 26 Supplemental Admission documents re: #22 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Iemma, Joseph)
July 21, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #22 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Scott. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS. filed by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) B-1, #4 Exhibit(s) B-2)(Vita, William)
July 16, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Kane Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5587502. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 New Atty efiling Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Iemma, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Scott Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5587469. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 New Attorney Efiling Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Iemma, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Scott Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5587448. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 New Attorney Efiling Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Iemma, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS. PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Affirmation in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Shira White, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-1- Protective Service Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Apology Letter from ADT to Plaintiff's Insured)(Munger, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Munger on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Munger, Michael) Modified on 7/9/2021 (dpk).
July 9, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #20 Notice of Appearance - modified docket text to reflect that attorney Michael Munger appears for Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. (dpk)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Munger, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/7/2021. (tab)
July 6, 2021 Filing 18 Supplemental Admission documents re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Bender, Heath)
July 6, 2021 Filing 17 Supplemental Admission documents re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Bender, Heath)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 Supplemental Admission documents re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Bender, Heath)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 Supplemental Admission documents re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Bender, Heath)
June 24, 2021 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Munger. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Declaration of Sponsor, Petition for Admission to Practice form published by the Court 12/2019, New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form; a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court within the last 6 months; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company Certificate of Good Standing (Bender, Heath)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Great Northern Insurance Company Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Bender, Heath)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Munger Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5564849. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bender, Heath)
June 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Heath A. Bender on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Bender, Heath)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting (in part) #9 Letter Request to adjourn the Initial Conference to another date. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 7/21/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/22/2021. (tab)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 with consent of Plaintiff's counsel, Letter Motion from Joseph Iemma for ADT LLC requesting Adjournment of initial pre-trial conference from July 21, 2021 to July 28, 2021 submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Iemma, Joseph)
June 21, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous/Other Relief. Corrected Text to reflect this is a Motion to Dismiss not a Notice. (khr)
June 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS. Response to Motion due by 7/12/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/19/2021 (sas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re #7 Memorandum of Law, #6 Motion to Dismiss by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1)(Iemma, Joseph) Modified on 6/21/2021 (khr).
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by ADT LLC. (Iemma, Joseph)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS by ADT LLC OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Iemma, Joseph) Modified on 6/21/2021 (khr). Modified on 6/21/2021 (khr).
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Great Northern Insurance Company; Attorney Michael S. Munger, Esq., Email address is Michael.Munger eustacelaw.com. Phone number is (212) 612-4200. Admissions due by 6/25/2021. (Notice of Admission requirement emailed to Counsel on 6/11/2021)(mgh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/21/2021 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ADT LLC identifying Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC for ADT LLC. (mgh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (mgh)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greene County Supreme Court, case number EF2021-250 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5552623) filed by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(mgh)
June 11, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for ADT LLC answer due 6/18/2021. (mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Joseph Iemma
Represented By: Jason Robert Scott
Represented By: Jordan A Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Heath A. Bender
Represented By: Michael Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?