Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Williamson et al
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Brittany Hubbard, Sandra Ella Williamson, Tonya Day-Jefferson and Sharee H. Fitzgerald
Case Number: 1:2021cv00705
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 PRO SE NOTICE issued On 8/13/2021. (khr)(Mailed copy of notice to pro se defendant, Williamson along with a copy of the pro se handbook and local rules)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sandra Ella Williamson.(khr)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Tonya Day-Jefferson waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Creed, Aimee)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Sharee H. Fitzgerald waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Creed, Aimee)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Brittany Hubbard waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Creed, Aimee)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. Sandra Ella Williamson waiver sent on 6/22/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Creed, Aimee)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Primerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Primerica, Inc., Other Affiliate Primerica Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Kayne Anderson Rudnick Investment Management LLC, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Primerica Life Insurance Company.. (Creed, Aimee)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/14/2021 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sandra Ella Williamson. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Sharee Fitzgerald, #2 Summons issued as to Brittany Hubbard, #3 Summons issued as to Tonya Day-Jefferson)(khr)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against Tonya Day-Jefferson, Sharee H. Fitzgerald, Brittany Hubbard, Sandra Ella Williamson (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5555787) filed by Primerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Primerica Life Insurance Company v. Williamson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Ella Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Day-Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharee H. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Primerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Aimee L. Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?