Orsak et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Emily Orsak and Julie Chatagnier
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00722
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/26/2021. (amt)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE: that Beech-Nut agrees to waive service in the subject action; that Plaintiffs and Beech-Nut agree that this action is properly consolidated with the Consolidated Action - Case No.: 1:21-CV-0133 - Thomas, et al. vs. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company, for pre-trial purposes pursuant to paragraph 4 of the Court's March 19, 2021 Order in the Consolidated Action; and that Beech-Nut's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint in this Action is mooted and Beech-Nut's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond shall be at such time as may be applicable in the Consolidated Action to the operative complaint in that action. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 06/24/2021. (hmr)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A. Jerome on behalf of Julie Chatagnier, Emily Orsak (Jerome, Chad)
June 24, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133 and not filed in this Case - MEMBER CASE: 1:21-CV=-0722. (hmr)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Consolidate this case with the Consolidated Action by Julie Chatagnier, Emily Orsak submitted to Judge McAvoy. (Reich, Mark)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting the Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 6/23/2021. (amt)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorney Courtney E. Maccarone, Email address is cmaccarone@zlk.com. Phone number is 212-363-7500. Admissions due by 7/6/2021. [Notice was emailed to Attorney Maccarone on 6/22/2021.](hmr)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (hmr)
June 22, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-CV-0133, 1:21-CV-0167, 1:21-CV-0183, etc. (hmr)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5562087) filed by Emily Orsak, Julie Charagnier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orsak et al v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Orsak
Represented By: Mark S. Reich
Represented By: Chad A. Jerome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Chatagnier
Represented By: Mark S. Reich
Represented By: Chad A. Jerome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?