Mezile v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Marie Mezile
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00756
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/26/2021. (amt)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William E. Hoese, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas A Abrahams, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab)
July 14, 2021 TEXT ONLY NOTICE - Pursuant to the #15 Stipulation and Order, this action is now consolidated under the Lead Case 1:21-cv-133 Thomas et al. v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. All future filings shall be made in the Lead Case only. No further docketing shall be done in this member case. (jel, )
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATION: Plaintiff and Beech-Nut agree that this action may be consolidated with the Consolidated Action - Case No. 1:21-cv-0133 - Thomas, et al. v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company, for pretrial purposes pursuant to paragraph 4 of the Court's March 19, 2021 Order in the Consolidated Action. Beech-Nut waivers service of the complaint in this action. Beech-Nut's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond tot he complaint in this Action is mooted and Beech-Nut's deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond shall be such time as may be applicable in the Consolidated action to the operative complaint in that action. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/13/2021. (jel, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION to waive service and consolidate case with Thomas 21cv0133 by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company submitted to Judge McAvoy. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William E. Hoese Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5579887. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Peluso, James)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas A. Abrahams Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5579871. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Peluso, James)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Hero AG, Other Affiliate Schwartau International GmbH, Other Affiliate AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/6/2021. (amt)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement SERVED VIA E-MAIL ON Attorneys Douglas A. Abrahams, William E. Hoese, Zahra R. Dean, and Aarthi Manohar. Whose e-mails are zdean@kohnswift.com, dabrahams@kohnswift.com, whoese@kohnswift.com, and amanohar@kohnswift.com respectfully. Telephone is (215) 238-1700. REGARDING Joseph C. Kohn chillwig@kohnswift.com (this email does not match, waiting for confirmation) Admissions due by 7/16/2021. (gmd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement SERVED VIA EMAIL ON Attorney Michael L. Roberts and Karen Halbert. Email address is mikeroberts@robertslawfirm.us and karenhalbert@robertslawfirm.us respectfully. Phone number is (501) 821-5575. Admissions due by 7/16/2021. (gmd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement SERVED VIA EMAIL ON Attorney David H. Fink and Nathan J. Fink. Email address is dfink@finkbressack.com and nfink@finkbressack.com respectfully. Phone number is (248) 971-2500. Admissions due by 7/16/2021. (gmd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (gmd) Modified on 7/2/2021 Updated file date to 7/2 (gmd).
July 2, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 Summons Issued, modified to correct filing date to 7/2/21 (gmd)
July 2, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-cv-00133-TJM-CFH. (gmd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND: against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5573430) filed by Marie Mezile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mezile v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Mezile
Represented By: James R. Peluso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?