Homesite Insurance Company of New York v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Dequan Greene Individually and d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare, Latrisha Greene individually and d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare, Dequan Greene Individually doing business as Harmony and Friends Daycare, Latrisha Greene individually doing business as Harmony and Friends Daycare and Carlos Figueroa
Case Number: 1:2021cv00772
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Proposed Order/Judgment, #11 Memorandum of Law, #12 Affidavit) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Amato, John)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Amato, Jr on behalf of Homesite Insurance Company of New York (Amato, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homesite Insurance Company of New York identifying Other Affiliate American Family Insurance for Homesite Insurance Company of New York.. (Cosgrove, Robert)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carlos Figueroa. Clerk initially added this party as an interested party. After consultation with counsel, it was requested that the party be named a defendant as listed in the complaint. (ztc, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/5/2021 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/28/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dequan Greene. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Latrisha Greene)(ztc, ) Modified on 7/7/2021 Both Summonses replaced with corrected versions. (ztc, ).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dequan Greene, Latrisha Greene (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5577028) filed by Homesite Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztc)
July 7, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY; The #2 Summons Issued were inadvertently uploaded without the clerk's signature. Both summonses have been replaced with the corrected versions. Service will be regenerated. (ztc)
July 7, 2021 TEXT NOTICE advising Plaintiff's Counsel that a summons will not be issued for Interested Party Carlos Figueroa as he is not a named defendant in the case. A summons has also not been issued for Dequan Greene and Latrisha Greene d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare as both parties were sued in their individual capacity and as d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare, and the Daycare was not named as a separate Defendant. (ztc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesite Insurance Company of New York v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homesite Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Robert J. Cosgrove
Represented By: John P Amato, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dequan Greene Individually and d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latrisha Greene individually and d/b/a Harmony and Friends Daycare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dequan Greene Individually doing business as Harmony and Friends Daycare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latrisha Greene individually doing business as Harmony and Friends Daycare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?