Abbott et al vs. Beech-Nut Company
Plaintiff: Rebecca Abbott, Erin Abdoo, Krystal Leigh Anderson, Angela Arrowsmith, Megan Ashley, Elizabeth Austin, Alyssa Megan Barb, Miriah Barbero, Lindsay Barr, Grisel Barreto, Courtney Barron, Ashley Baxter, Brittany Bennett, Julie Blakeley, Kelsey Blankenship, Melissa Bloomquist-Smith, Cristen Boles, Amanda Boots, Olivia Boyer, Amanda Bratton, Crystal Brinig, Augustina Briones, Nicole Brisky, Cheyenne Browning, Celia Bruno, Ana Butkus, Serenitey Carlin, Mayelin Carranza, Anna Chase, Sheral Shah Chheda, Samantha Clark, Victoria Coker, Melanie Cole, Jen Comeau, Kimberly Conway, Adrianne Cooper, Michelle Corbett, Angela Cox, Elaine Cryer, Kaley Deford, Chelzy Desvigne, Brittany Distaso, Alycia Donovan, Alana Doyeto, Jessica Durett, Sudipta Dutta, Natalya Dzyuba, Samantha Edwards, Amanda Fincannon, Theresa Marie Fintonis, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Marcela Garcia, Angela Gardner, Carissa Geloso, Shelby Geraci, Arundeep Kanwar Guraya, Charita Harrell, Gabrielle Harrison, Debbie Hawkins, Shannon Herrington, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Sammi Hobdy, Shaylan Isaacs, Jasmine Jackson, Yuhwa Jang, Olivia Johnson, Rebbeca N Keeton, Heather A Key, Sara Kilburn, Sarah Knaapen, Rachel Knudson, Sarah Kohn, Karleen Kozaczka, Rachael Kruup, Deana Linegar, April Lockhart, Andrew Lohse, Lori Ann Louise, Samantha Lui, Elina Mahmens, Brittany Martin, Marquetta Mathews, Elizabeth McDowell, Kali McGlinch, LaToya McHenry, Lori-Ann McKensie-Henry, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Renee Miline, Loukevia Moore, Amanda Gambrell Morency, Andrea Mozo, Tabitha Mullinax, Stephanie Norgaard, Leah M Ostapchenko, Corinthea Pangelinan, Robert Partello, Melinda Pass, Krishna Patel, Mia Pelletier, Tina Marie Perez, Maurice Carlos Petetson, Ashley Pierce, Ali Pliler-Lopez, Holly Plotts, Janine E Price, Sarah Ridings, Maggie Rouse, Tiffany Salazar, Bridget Salopek, Christina Salyers, Sheena Sanders, Lea Santos, Amanda Schram, Brenda Schroeder, Cat Searle, Cheryl Elaine Smith, Kinder Smith, Abby Sondall, Kirsten South, Christine Steele, Abby Stratton, Rachel Stratton, Ashley Swenningson, Kyla C Talley, Margo Tezeno, Shiloh Thomas, Katrina Thomas, Rhianna Thornton, Casey Tisdale, Dillon Townzen, Rachael Treetop, Emma Trolinder, Megan Troyer, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Brittany (Dutton) Wallace, Monique Warren, Beverly Watkins, Jennifer Kay Watts, Natalie Williams, Acacia Wilson, Retrena Younge, Charisse Zapata, Jessica Durrett, Rebecca N. Keeton, Lori Ann Louis, Marquetta Matthews, Elizabeth A. McDowell, LaToya A. McHenry, Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry, Renee Milline, Janinne E. Price, Karina Pena and Amber Wright
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00822
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Stephen J. Telken stating that both Troy E. Walton and Steve Telken intend to remain counsel of record for Plaintiffs and will be submitting Pro Hac Vice Applications. (hmr)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/26/2021. (amt)
July 22, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-cv-00133-TJM-CFH. (gmd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Abbott, et al. Attorney Aaron M. Zigler, Email address is aaron@ziglerlawgroup.com. Phone number is (312) 673-8427. Admissions due by 8/3/2021. (gmd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Abbott, et al. Attorney Troy E. Walton and Steve Telken whose email addresses are twalton@waltontelken.com and stelken@waltonteklen.com respectively. Their phone number is (618) 307-9880. Admissions due by 8/3/2021. (gmd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2021 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (gmd)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5589789) filed by Margo Tezeno, Victoria Coker, Renee Miline, Cheryl Elaine Smith, Sara Kilburn, Tina Marie Perez, Amanda Boots, Ashley Swenningson, Melissa Bloomquist-Smith, Alana Doyeto, Shelby Geraci, Marquetta Mathews, Serenitey Carlin, Stephanie Norgaard, Amanda Bratton, Maggie Rouse, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Samantha Clark, Kimberly Conway, Courtney Barron, April Lockhart, Andrea Mozo, Holly Plotts, Shaylan Isaacs, Anna Chase, Monique Warren, Lea Santos, Kelsey Blankenship, Brittany (Dutton) Wallace, Samantha Lui, Gabrielle Harrison, Mia Pelletier, Rachel Knudson, Kali McGlinch, Rachael Kruup, Shannon Herrington, Yuhwa Jang, Beverly Watkins, Katrina Thomas, Erin Abdoo, Cristen Boles, Tiffany Salazar, Elina Mahmens, Megan Troyer, Julie Blakeley, Christina Salyers, Rebbeca N Keeton, Amanda Fincannon, Cheyenne Browning, Jennifer Kay Watts, Rachel Stratton, Ashley Pierce, Casey Tisdale, Kirsten South, Andrew Lohse, Nicole Brisky, Leah M Ostapchenko, Kyla C Talley, Natalya Dzyuba, Miriah Barbero, Robert Partello, Michelle Corbett, Cat Searle, Alycia Donovan, Megan Ashley, Melanie Cole, Crystal Brinig, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Alyssa Megan Barb, Ana Butkus, Lori Ann Louise, Kinder Smith, Melinda Pass, Sarah Knaapen, Sarah Kohn, Debbie Hawkins, Sarah Ridings, Amanda Schram, Amanda Gambrell Morency, Maurice Carlos Petetson, Grisel Barreto, Sheena Sanders, Acacia Wilson, Loukevia Moore, Samantha Edwards, Janine E Price, LaToya McHenry, Deana Linegar, Rachael Treetop, Abby Stratton, Theresa Marie Fintonis, Elaine Cryer, Sammi Hobdy, Corinthea Pangelinan, Ashley Baxter, Chelzy Desvigne, Marcela Garcia, Arundeep Kanwar Guraya, Jessica Durett, Jasmine Jackson, Olivia Boyer, Carissa Geloso, Heather A Key, Olivia Johnson, Rebecca Abbott, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Lori-Ann McKensie-Henry, Brenda Schroeder, Charisse Zapata, Natalie Williams, Sheral Shah Chheda, Krishna Patel, Celia Bruno, Shiloh Thomas, Mayelin Carranza, Abby Sondall, Emma Trolinder, Kaley Deford, Karleen Kozaczka, Brittany Martin, Charita Harrell, Rhianna Thornton, Angela Gardner, Christine Steele, Retrena Younge, Brittany Distaso, Augustina Briones, Sudipta Dutta, Brittany Bennett, Ali Pliler-Lopez, Elizabeth Austin, Elizabeth McDowell, Adrianne Cooper, Krystal Leigh Anderson, Tabitha Mullinax, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Lindsay Barr, Bridget Salopek, Angela Cox, Angela Arrowsmith, Jen Comeau, Dillon Townzen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al vs. Beech-Nut Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Abbott
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Abdoo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Leigh Anderson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Arrowsmith
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Ashley
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Austin
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Megan Barb
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriah Barbero
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Barr
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grisel Barreto
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Barron
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Baxter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Bennett
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Blakeley
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Blankenship
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bloomquist-Smith
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristen Boles
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Boots
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Boyer
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bratton
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Brinig
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustina Briones
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Brisky
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Browning
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Bruno
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Butkus
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serenitey Carlin
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayelin Carranza
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Chase
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheral Shah Chheda
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Clark
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Coker
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Cole
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Comeau
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Conway
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne Cooper
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Corbett
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cox
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Cryer
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaley Deford
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelzy Desvigne
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Distaso
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alycia Donovan
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Doyeto
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Durett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sudipta Dutta
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Dzyuba
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Edwards
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Fincannon
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Fintonis
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayame Tatiana Galassini
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Garcia
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gardner
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Geloso
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Geraci
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arundeep Kanwar Guraya
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charita Harrell
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Harrison
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Hawkins
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Herrington
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hobbs-Rogers
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammi Hobdy
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaylan Isaacs
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Jackson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuhwa Jang
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Johnson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebbeca N Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather A Key
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Kilburn
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Knaapen
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Knudson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Kohn
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karleen Kozaczka
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Kruup
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Linegar
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Lockhart
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lohse
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Louise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Lui
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elina Mahmens
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Martin
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kali McGlinch
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToya McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori-Ann McKensie-Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Miline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loukevia Moore
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Gambrell Morency
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Mozo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Mullinax
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Norgaard
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah M Ostapchenko
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinthea Pangelinan
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Partello
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Pass
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Patel
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Pelletier
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Perez
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Carlos Petetson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Pierce
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Pliler-Lopez
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Plotts
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine E Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ridings
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Rouse
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Salazar
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Salopek
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Salyers
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Sanders
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Santos
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Schram
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Schroeder
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cat Searle
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Elaine Smith
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinder Smith
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Sondall
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten South
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Steele
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby Stratton
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Stratton
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Swenningson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyla C Talley
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Tezeno
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiloh Thomas
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Thomas
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhianna Thornton
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Tisdale
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Townzen
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Treetop
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Trolinder
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Troyer
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Renee Twiggs
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany (Dutton) Wallace
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Warren
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Watkins
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kay Watts
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Williams
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acacia Wilson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retrena Younge
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charisse Zapata
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Durrett
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca N. Keeton
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Louis
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquetta Matthews
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. McDowell
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToya A. McHenry
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Milline
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janinne E. Price
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Pena
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Wright
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph P Guglielmo
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?