Swartz v. Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Swartz
Defendant: Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corp, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli and Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00880
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli.(Billok, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER dismissing as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by consent of the parties, in light of the filing of #9 Amended Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 8/31/2021. (bjw, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER BRIEF as Consent to the Withdrawal of the Partial Motion to Dismiss by Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli. (Billok, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER In light of the recently filed #9 Amended Complaint and #10 Letter by plaintiff requesting that the pending #6 Motion to Dismiss be withdrawn as moot, defense counsel shall advise the Court by 9/3/2021 whether or not they consent to the withdrawal of the motion.. IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 8/31/2021. (bjw, ) Modified on 9/1/2021 (bjw, ).
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER BRIEF by Michael Swartz. (Tyreman, Erin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. and Thomas Pasquerelli filed by Michael Swartz. (Attachments: #1 AOS)(Tyreman, Erin) Modified on 8/27/2021 to correct defendants names(gmd, ).
August 27, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. answer due 9/10/2021; Thomas Pasquerelli answer due 9/10/2021. (gmd, )
August 27, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #9 Amended Complaint: Clerk corrected defendants names in the docket text. (gmd, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' #7 Letter Request, on consent, seeking to adjourn the Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for September 3, 2021 before the undersigned and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the partial motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/17/2021. (mab)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Michael D. Billok for Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli requesting Adjournment of Rule 16 Conference submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Billok, Michael)
August 10, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim corrected to be made returnable before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. (bjw, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli. Motion returnable before Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Response to Motion due by 8/30/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Billok, Michael) Modified on 8/10/2021 (bjw, ).
August 9, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #1 Notice of Removal, to add the civil cover sheet. (gmd, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Plaintiff on August 5, 2021, filed by Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli. (Billok, Michael)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc., Thomas Pasquerelli. (Billok, Michael) Modified on 8/5/2021 (gmd, ).
August 5, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY to add an S to Corp in the Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. party and in docket entry #1 and #4. (gmd)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/3/2021 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Michael Swartz. (gmd)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of NYS County of Montgomery, case number EF2021-475 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5604489) filed by Thomas Pasquerelli, Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B: Electronic Filing Confirmation, #3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Service: GAVAC, #4 Exhibit D: Affidavit of Service: Pasquerelli, #5 Exhibit E: Defendants Consent For Removal, #6 Exhibit F: Declaration of Thomas Pasquerelli)(gmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swartz v. Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Swartz
Represented By: Erin Tyreman
Represented By: Kenneth J. Bobrycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corp, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pasquerelli
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Amsterdam Volunteer Ambulance Corps, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?