Dio Magna LLC v. Pongnon et al
Plaintiff: Dio Magna LLC
Defendant: Mrkerlenda Pongnon, Marie St. Jean, Royal Lux LLC, Ero's Nectar LLC and Royal Luxs LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00898
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on August 13, 2021. (sas)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dio Magna LLC (Lin, David)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mrkerlenda Pongnon. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Royal Luxs LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Marie St. Jean, #3 Summons Issued as to Ero's Nectar LLC)(pjh, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Dio Magna LLC is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Lin, David)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Attorney Michael D. Cilento. Email address is Michael@iLawco.com. Phone number is (718) 243-9323. Admissions due by 8/25/2021. {Notice served on attorney via email}(pjh, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/2/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ero's Nectar LLC, Mrkerlenda Pongnon, Royal Lux LLC and Marie St. Jean (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5612536) filed by Dio Magna LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dio Magna LLC v. Pongnon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dio Magna LLC
Represented By: David D. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrkerlenda Pongnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie St. Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Lux LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ero's Nectar LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Luxs LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?