Lewis v. Primecare Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Lewis
Defendant: Primecare Medical, Inc., PersonalCare Professional Registered Nursing, P.C., PrimeCare Medical of NY, Inc., Warren County, PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C. and PrimeCare Medical of New York, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00930
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jason Lewis. PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C. waiver sent on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; PrimeCare Medical of New York, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021; Primecare Medical, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Sovern, Cheryl)
October 4, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Warren County answer due 10/25/2021. (gmd, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, NDNY General Order 50 served on Warren County Treasurer, Michael Swan on 10/1/2021, filed by Jason Lewis. (Sovern, Cheryl)
September 20, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #5 Notice of Appearance: Clerk added attorney to the docket and edited text to accurately reflect the attorney in the document. (gmd, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Harrigan on behalf of PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C., PrimeCare Medical of New York, Inc., Primecare Medical, Inc. (Wilkinson, Benjamin) Modified on 9/20/2021 (gmd, ).
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Wilkinson on behalf of PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C., PrimeCare Medical of New York, Inc., Primecare Medical, Inc. (Wilkinson, Benjamin)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/9/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Warren County, #1 PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C., #2 PrimeCare Medical, Inc., and #3 PrimeCare Medical of NY, Inc.(gmd, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/18/2021 to include 2nd page of summons) (gmd, ).
August 18, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #2 Summons Issued, to replace attachment #2 for one with the 2nd page of the summons. (gmd, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against PersonalCare Professional Registered Nursing, P.C., PrimeCare Medical of NY, Inc., Primecare Medical, Inc., Warren County (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5618783) filed by Jason Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Primecare Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lewis
Represented By: Cheryl L. Sovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Harrigan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PersonalCare Professional Registered Nursing, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare Medical of NY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PersonalCare Registered Professional Nursing, P.C.
Represented By: Christopher J. Harrigan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimeCare Medical of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Harrigan
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?