Thomas v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zeakwon Thomas
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01022
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 3/31/2022. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/21/2021. (mab)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2022. Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure Deadline is 6/2/2022. Defendant's Expert Disclosure Deadline is 7/18/2022. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 8/1/2022. Motions to be filed by 8/31/2022. Status Report due by 1/21/2022. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 3/31/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/21/2021. (mab)
October 19, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/2021. Appearances: Charlene Fallon, Esq. for Plaintiff and Michael Cavanagh, Esq. for Defendant. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (mab)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosure, with supporting Exhibit served on Charlene S. Fallon, Esq. on October 11, 2021, filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Cavanagh, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zeakwon Thomas (Fallon, Charlene)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN to Honorable Daniel J. Stewart by Walmart, Inc.. (Cavanagh, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Court Clerk, #2 Certificate of Service)(Cavanagh, Michael)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Cavanagh, Michael)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
September 17, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk changed the date of filing to accurately reflect time of filing. (gmd, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc.(gmd, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Zeakwon Thomas. (gmd, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York Supreme Court: County of Albany, case number 906982-20 (Filing fee $402 receipt number #ANYNDC-5650302) filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Request for Supplemental Demand for Damages, #4 Exhibit D: State Court Response to Request for Supplemental Demand for Damages, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd, ) Modified on 9/17/2021 (gmd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeakwon Thomas
Represented By: Charlene S. Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?