Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Rodick et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Adam Rodick, Stephanie Rodick and MDP
Case Number: 1:2021cv01039
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 8705
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by MDP.(Greer, Aimee)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Stephanie Rodick on 09/29/2021, filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Adam Rodick on 09/29/2021, filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
October 4, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Adam Rodick answer due 10/20/2021; Stephanie Rodick answer due 10/20/2021. (mgh)
September 29, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for MDP answer due 11/22/2021. (mgh)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Nicolello, Richard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/13/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc., Other Affiliate Economy Premier Assurance Company, Other Affiliate Farmers Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Fire Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Truck Insurance Exchange for Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (egr)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adam Rodick. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Stephanie Rodick, #2 Summons Issued as to MDP)(egr) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/21/2021) (egr, ).
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Rodick, Stephanie Rodick, and MDP, (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5654462) filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)
September 21, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 Summons Issued - Resubmitted MDP Summons as per Attorney's Office upon receipt of new MDP Summons to include "Underlying Action." (egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Rodick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard John Nicolello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Rodick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Rodick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDP
Represented By: Aimee Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?