Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al v. Positive Energy NY, LLC
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company and Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Positive Energy NY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01047
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Text Only Order - Pending before the court is plaintiffs' motion for default judgment to be entered by the Clerk pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(1) and Local Rule 55.2(a). (Dkt. No. 13.) Local Rule 55.2(a) provides that the party seeking a default judgment "shall submit, with the form of judgment, the Clerk's certificate of entry of default, a statement of showing the principal amount due, not to exceed the amount demanded in the complaint, giving credit for any payments, and showing the amounts and dates of payment, a computation of the interest to the day of judgment, a per diem rate of interest, and the costs and taxable disbursements claimed." Plaintiffs' motion does not include the required form of judgment, and is, therefore, DENIED with leave to renew in full compliance with the above-referenced rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/18/2021. (jel, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Positive Energy NY, LLC filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 12/8/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Declaration in Support) (Gross, Marc)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for December 21, 2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending further direction by the Court. (tab)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Text Only Order - A clerk's entry of default was entered against defendant Positive Energy NY, LLC on October 26, 2021. (Dkt. No. 10). Plaintiffs are directed to file their motion for default judgment or a status report within thirty (30) days of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/27/2021. (jel, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's Certificate of Action Taken on Plaintiff's #9 Request for ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Positive Energy NY, LLC. (dpk)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Positive Energy NY, LLC by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default)(Gross, Marc)
October 12, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Positive Energy NY, LLC answer due 10/22/2021. (hmr)
October 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Gross on behalf of Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Gross, Marc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint against Positive Energy NY, LLC served on Secretary of State on 10/1/21, filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Gross, Marc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO LETTER BRIEF filed by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company as to #5 Notice of Admission Requirement . (Gross, Marc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Twin City Fire Insurance Company, et al.; Attorney Marc J. Gross, Esq. admissions due by 10/6/2021. (Sent by regular mail and email to Attorney Gross on 9/22/2021) (dpk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (dpk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Positive Energy NY, LLC. (dpk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/14/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Positive Energy NY, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5655988) filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company and Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al v. Positive Energy NY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark G. Ledwin
Represented By: Marc J. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Mark G. Ledwin
Represented By: Marc J. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark G. Ledwin
Represented By: Marc J. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Positive Energy NY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?