Hoffman v. American Institute of Indian Studies
Plaintiff: Peter M Hoffman
Defendant: American Institute of Indian Studies
Case Number: 1:2021cv01105
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter Motion from Daniel W. Coffey, Esq. for American Institute of Indian Studies requesting extension of time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Sannes . (Coffey, Daniel)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for American Institute of Indian Studies answer due 12/13/2021. (kmc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION to extend time for defendant to respond to complaint by American Institute of Indian Studies submitted to Judge Sannes. (Coffey, Daniel)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION extending time for Defendant to respond to Complaint by American Institute of Indian Studies submitted to Judge Sannes. (Coffey, Daniel)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Coffey on behalf of All Defendants (Coffey, Daniel)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on American Institute of Indian Studies on 10/29/2021, filed by Peter M Hoffman. (Castiglione, Joseph)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for American Institute of Indian Studies answer due 11/19/2021. (khr)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brenda K. Sannes for all further proceedings.. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/26/2021. (khr)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Philip H. Stillman, Email address is pstillman@stillmanassociates.com. Phone number is (888)-235-4279. Admissions due by 10/26/2021. Attorney Stillman served by email. (ds)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/6/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ds)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Institute of Indian Studies. (ds)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Institute of Indian Studies (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5676033) filed by Peter M Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. American Institute of Indian Studies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter M Hoffman
Represented By: Joseph F. Castiglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute of Indian Studies
Represented By: Daniel W. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?