Gale v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Gale
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01161
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 JPMDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2). Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Middle District of Florida for inclusion into MDL No. 3006, IN RE: TASIGNA (NILOTINIB) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Case assigned to the Hon. Roy B. Dalton, Jr. (see)
November 9, 2021 Case transferred electronically to the Middle District of Florida for inclusion into MDL-3006. (see)
November 9, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:21-cv-01873, filed 11/09/2021. (see)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff's Counsel James G. Onder, Esq. & Lawana S. Wichmann, Esq.. Notice and courtesy copy of GO25 served via email on: onder@onderlaw.com & wichmann@onderlaw.com. Phone number of Counsel is (314) 963-9000. Admissions due by 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement - James G. Onder, Esq.)(map)
October 26, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk replaced the Main Attachment of the #3 General Order 25 with a version that has the last page's verbiage together on one page. (map). Clerk modified docket text on 11/9/2021 to fix the title of docket entry to the true event of Clerk's Correction of Docket Entry, it is not a Clerk's Entry of Default as previously noted. (map)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Albany before U.S. Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/18/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map) (Clerk replaced the Main Attachment of the #3 General Order 25 with a version that has the last page verbiage together on one page) (map).
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (map)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5692239) filed by Mary Ellen Gale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Gale
Represented By: Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?