All American Insurance Company v. Xiao
Plaintiff: All American insurance Company
Defendant: Jian Fei Xiao doing business as Dragon Garden Restaurant
Case Number: 1:2021cv01169
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jian Fei Xiao.(Conway, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All American insurance Company. Jian Fei Xiao served on 10/30/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Luccaro, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/19/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
October 29, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order - Amended General Order 25 issued to identify the correct District Judge Assigned to the case. (jel, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All American insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CENTRAL INSURANCE GROUP for All American insurance Company.. (Luccaro, Daniel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/26/2022 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/19/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jian Fei Xiao. (mgh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jian Fei Xiao (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5694957) filed by All American insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All American Insurance Company v. Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All American insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Luccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Fei Xiao doing business as Dragon Garden Restaurant
Represented By: Michael C. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?