Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al v. Fredericks et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Carl Fredericks, Judith Fredericks, Eric Jones, Maura Harrington and Maryann Harrington
Case Number: 1:2021cv01194
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Judith Fredericks served on 11/27/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Kohane, Dan)
December 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Carl Fredericks served on 11/27/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Kohane, Dan)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Maura Harrington, Eric Jones, Maryann Harrington.(Better, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Eric Jones served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Casella, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Maryann Harrington served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Casella, Thomas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. Maura Harrington served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Casella, Thomas)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee S. Siegel on behalf of Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Siegel, Lee)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance and Allstate Indemnity Company; Attorney Lee S. Siegel, Email address is lss@hurwitzfine.com. Phone number is (716)849-8900. Admissions due by 11/16/2021. (egr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/1/2022 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/25/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carl Fredericks, with attached Summons issued to: Judith Fredericks, Maryann Harrington, Maura Harrington, Eric Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Eric Jones, #2 Summons Issued as to Judith Fredericks, #3 Summons Issued as to Maryann Harrington, #4 Summons Issued as to Maura Harrington)(egr)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Carl Fredericks, Judith Fredericks, Maryann Harrington, Maura Harrington, Eric Jones (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5699850) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(egr) Modified on 11/2/2021 to reflect correct date of filing (egr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al v. Fredericks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Casella
Represented By: Lee S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Thomas Casella
Represented By: Lee S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Fredericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Fredericks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jones
Represented By: William J. Better
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Harrington
Represented By: William J. Better
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryann Harrington
Represented By: William J. Better
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?