Lorefice v. State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Alan Lorefice
Defendant: State of New York and Department of Environmental Conservation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01367
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion from Mark G. Mitchell for Department of Environmental Conservation, State of New York requesting extension of time for the Defendants to respond to the Complaint, on consent : Department of Environmental Conservation answer due 2/25/2022; State of New York answer due 2/25/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/12/2022. (tab)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Mark G. Mitchell for Department of Environmental Conservation, State of New York requesting extension of time for the Defendants to respond to the Complaint, on consent submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Mitchell, Mark)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Mitchell on behalf of All Defendants (Mitchell, Mark)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint in a Civil Action, Notice, and filing Order served on Anthony London Esq. for DEC on 12/27/2001, filed by Alan Lorefice. (Sussman, Michael)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint in a Civil Action, Notice, and filing Order served on Cristal Gazelone for AG on 12/27/2001, filed by Alan Lorefice. (Sussman, Michael)
January 4, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Department of Environmental Conservation answer due 1/18/2022; State of New York answer due 1/18/2022. (dpk)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (dpk)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Environmental Conservation, State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the Department of Environmental Conservation)(dpk)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2022 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/15/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Environmental Conservation and State of New York (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5750907) filed by Alan Lorefice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorefice v. State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Lorefice
Represented By: Michael H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Environmental Conservation
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?