Kirkpatrick v. Genesco Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Kirkpatrick
Defendant: Genesco Inc. doing business as Journeys
Not Classified By Court: Michael Ungar
Case Number: 1:2021cv01369
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER approving #41 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Genesco, Inc. d/b/a Journeys are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 2/25/2023. (sal)
February 24, 2023 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Michael Kirkpatrick. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER approving #39 Stipulation filed by Genesco Inc. and resetting deadlines as set forth ( Discovery due by 5/10/2023, Motions to be filed by 5/25/2023, Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/10/2023.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/29/2022. (tab)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Parties' Expert Witness and Mediation Deadlines by Genesco Inc.. (Miller, Matthew)
November 3, 2022 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Michael Kirkpatrick. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER approving #35 Notice (Other) filed by Genesco Inc. withdrawing attorney/firm. Attorney Douglas A. Vonderhaar; Sarah A. Ballard and Rand L. McClellan terminated. Authoirzed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/23/2022. (tab)
August 19, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Richardson on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Richardson, Amy)
August 19, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE by Genesco Inc. [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel] (McClellan, Rand)
August 16, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE by Genesco Inc. of Firm Name Change (Miller, Matthew)
August 10, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Phurrough Bagg on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Bagg, Jennifer)
August 10, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Miller on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Miller, Matthew)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Text ORDER granting #29 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice pf Jennifer P. Bagg, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/9/2022. (tab)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew G. Miller, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/9/2022. (tab)
August 5, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer P. Bagg Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5992139. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Attorney Registrations Form, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Sullivan, William)
August 5, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew G. Miller Filing fee $100, receipt number CNYNDC-5992077. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Attorney Registrations Form, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Sullivan, William)
August 4, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Sullivan on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Sullivan, William)
May 16, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Hiraldo on behalf of Michael Kirkpatrick (Hiraldo, Manuel)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Manuel S. Hiraldo, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/6/2022. (tab)
May 3, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Manuel S. Hiraldo Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5890701. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Shamis, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Michael Ungar has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Andrew J. Shamis and. Dated: April 25, 2022(Shamis, Andrew)
April 14, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Gold on behalf of Michael Kirkpatrick (Gold, Christopher)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chris Gold, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/1/2022. (tab)
March 30, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chris Gold Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5855278. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Attorney Registration Form, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Shamis, Andrew)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2022. Discovery due by 3/10/2023. Motions to be filed by 3/25/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/10/2022. Status Report due by 11/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/29/2022. (tab)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 4/26/2022. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/28/2022. (tab)
March 25, 2022 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/25/2022 by telephone. [10:00am-10:06am]. Appearances by Andrew Shamis, Esq. for plaintiff; Rand L. McClellan, Esq. for defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a Scheduling Order will be issued. (tab)
March 22, 2022 Filing 17 COURT NOTICE of Conference: The Initial Conference has been reset for Friday, 3/25/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call on 3/25/2022 @ 10:00 AM. (tab)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion/Request for telephone participation at the Rule 16 conference: Counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call on 3/22/2022 @ 9:00 AM. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/15/2022. (tab)
March 14, 2022 Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Genesco Inc.. (McClellan, Rand)
March 10, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, [Joint Motion to Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference] filed by Genesco Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2022 Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Vonderhaar, Douglas)
March 3, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Genesco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(McClellan, Rand)
February 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Vonderhaar on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Vonderhaar, Douglas)
February 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rand L. McClellan on behalf of Genesco Inc. (McClellan, Rand)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER approving #9 Stipulation filed by Genesco Inc. Answer due date updated for Genesco Inc.: answer due 3/3/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/14/2022. (tab)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint [Second Stipulation and Order to Extend Defendant Genesco Inc.'s Time to Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint] by Genesco Inc. submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (McClellan, Rand)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER approving #7 Stipulation filed by Genesco Inc. Answer due date updated for Genesco Inc.: answer due 2/10/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/18/2022. (tab)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Defendant Genesco Inc.'s Time to Move or Plead to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Genesco Inc. submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (Ballard, Sarah)
January 17, 2022 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genesco Inc.. (Ballard, Sarah)
January 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A. Ballard on behalf of Genesco Inc. (Ballard, Sarah)
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Kirkpatrick. Genesco Inc. served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Shamis, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/15/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Genesco Inc. (mgh)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesco Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5752152) filed by Michael Kirkpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkpatrick v. Genesco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Andrew Shamis
Represented By: Christopher C. Gold
Represented By: Manuel Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesco Inc. doing business as Journeys
Represented By: Sarah A. Ballard
Represented By: Rand L. McClellan
Represented By: Douglas A. Vonderhaar
Represented By: Amy E. Richardson
Represented By: Jennifer Phurrough Bagg
Represented By: Matthew G. Miller
Represented By: William B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Michael Ungar
Represented By: Michael Ungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?