U.S. Bank National Association v. Casimo et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Frank Casimo and John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Case Number: 1:2021cv01372
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Frank Casimo on 02/03/2022, filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Battista, Joseph)
February 18, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Frank Casimo answer due 2/24/2022. (hmr)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Frank Casimo. (hmr)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): U.S. Bank National Association is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Battista, Joseph) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/27/2021) (hmr, ).
December 27, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons(es): Clerk replaced this document with a corrected document. (hmr)
December 27, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (hmr)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Frank Casimo, John Doe #1 through John Doe #12 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5753048) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Metes & Bounds, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignments, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Casimo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Joseph F. Battista, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Casimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1 through John Doe #12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?