Mehrotra v. General Electric (GE)
Plaintiff: Shashi Mehrotra
Defendant: General Electric (GE)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00271
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: As was directed during the 5/18/2022 telephone conference with the Court, Plaintiff is directed to file a clean and complete version of the Amended Complaint by 6/10/2022. Plaintiff's #19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint is terminated/denied as moot. Defendant(s) answer/response to the Amended Complaint will be due by 7/5/2022. The Initial Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines will be reset, under separate notice. So Ordered. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/18/2022. (tab)
May 18, 2022 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Status Conference held on 5/18/2022 by telephone. Appearances by pro se Plaintiff, Shashi Mehrotra; Alnisa Bell, Esq., Lisa Savadjian, Esq. and Davis Woodruff, Esq. for Defendant GE. The Court advises plaintiff that he can file an amended complaint as a matter of right and he is directed to do that on or before 6/10/2022. Defendant is directed to file their answer/response to the amended complaint in accordance with the FRCP or by July 5th. Plaintiff's request at Dkt. 14 will be terminated, as Plaintiff is prepared to file the Amended Complaint, naming a 2nd defendant. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, Dkt. no. 19 will be denied as moot. Defendant's request at Dkt. no. 21 is considered addressed, based on this conference. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino)[9:00 am-9:08am] (tab)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion from Shashi Mehrotra- Plaintiff requesting Change in date of appearance in court : The Status Conference has been reset for Wednesday, 5/18/2022 @ 9:00 AM. The conference will be conducted by telephone and Plaintiff Mehrotra and Defense counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and use security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/13/2022. (tab)
May 12, 2022 Filing 23 Letter Motion from Shashi Mehrotra- Plaintiff for Shashi Mehrotra requesting Change in date of appearance in court submitted to Judge Christian Hummel . (Mehrotra, Shashi)
May 12, 2022 Filing 22 COURT NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference has been set for Friday, 5/20/2022 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Defense counsel is directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and use security code 1234# to join the call. Plaintiff is directed to appear in-person and is directed to report to Courtroom #3 on the 4th floor of the James T. Foley, U.S. Courthouse, located at 445 Broadway, in Albany, NY.(tab)
May 10, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #21 Letter Request/Motion, Clerk edited the docket text of the entry to better reflect defendants filing. Defendants originally filed the entry as a response but it is a Letter Requesting an adjournment of deadlines and for Plaintiff to file a "Clean version" of the Amended Complaint. The entry is now pending before Judge Christian F. Hummel. (ztc, )
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 Letter Request/Motion re #19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Shashi Mehrotra. requesting adjournment of deadlines, and for Plaintiff to file a "Clean Version" of the Amended Complaint filed by General Electric (GE). (Bell, Alnisa) Modified on 5/10/2022 to edit docket text to better reflect the filing by defendants (ztc, ).
May 4, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Electric (GE) filed by Shashi Mehrotra.(Mehrotra, Shashi)
May 4, 2022 Filing 19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Shashi Mehrotra. Response to Motion due by 5/25/2022 Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mehrotra, Shashi)
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION Obtain Information from General Electric Company for Proper Definition of Defendants in the Plaintiff's Complaint and Issuance of Summons filed by Shashi Mehrotra. filed by General Electric (GE). (Bell, Alnisa)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Pro Se Motion to Obtain ECF Login and Password: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #10 request for permission to electronically file documents via CM/ECF. Since Plaintiff has filed a certification as directed showing that he is in compliance with the Court's requirements, permission is granted for Plaintiff to participate in electronic case filing. The Clerk will provide to the pro se filer an email with a link directing the filer to submit an E-Filing Registration Request in PACER. The pro se litigant must use the link in the email to submit the E-Filing Registration Request in PACER. Once the Court receives the request through Single Sign on, the Attorney Admission Clerk will link the PACER account to NDNY CM/ECF case, allowing the filer to file electronically in our Court. The Court may revoke these electronic filing privileges if it determines in its sole discretion that Plaintiff's use of the system is not satisfactory. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/18/2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(tab)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion from Alnisa Bell for General Electric (GE) requesting adjournment of Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint until 14 days after forthcoming Amended Complaint is filed. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/18/2022. (tab)
April 13, 2022 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Alnisa Bell for General Electric (GE) requesting adjournment of Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint until 14 days after forthcoming Amended Complaint is filed submitted to Judge Hummel . (Bell, Alnisa)
April 8, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Obtain Information from General Electric Company for Proper Definition of Defendants in the Plaintiff's Complaint and Issuance of Summons filed by Shashi Mehrotra. Response to Motion due by 5/2/2022 Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (ztc, )
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 PRO SE NOTICE signed by Shashi Mehrotra. (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Text Only Order Pending is plaintiffs letter motion seeking permission to file an amended complaint and a motion to remand. (Dkt. No. 9) The courts permission is not necessary for plaintiff to file a motion to amend the complaint, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 15, or a motion to remand, see 28 U.S. Code 1447(c). To the extent the letter motion seeks leave to file an amended complaint, it is DENIED for failure to comply with Local Rule of Practice 15.1. While the court cannot provide a litigant with legal advice, should plaintiff file a motion to amend the complaint or to remand, the motion should fully comply with the Local Rules of Practice and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/31/22. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
March 29, 2022 Filing 11 Pro Se ECF Registration Form by Shashi Mehrotra. (ztc, )
March 29, 2022 Filing 10 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Shashi Mehrotra. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (ztc, )
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 State Court Complaint and Remand to State Court filed by Shashi Mehrotra. Motion returnable before Judge Gary L. Sharpe. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/26/2022. (ztc, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion from Alnisa Bell, Esq. for General Electric (GE) requesting (1) a 30 day extension, up through and including April 27, 2022 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and (2) an adjournment of the initial conference : General Electric (GE) answer extended and due 4/27/2022. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for April 25, 2022 at 10:00 AM and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED, to be reset by the Court at the appropriate time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/24/2022. (Copy served via regular mail on 3/24/2022 on Plaintiff)(tab)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Alnisa Bell, Esq. for General Electric (GE) requesting (1) a 30 day extension, up through and including April 27, 2022 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and (2) an adjournment of the initial conference scheduled for April 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. and all other case deadlines in the Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Docket No. 2) until a decision is made on the motion to dismiss. submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Bell, Alnisa)
March 24, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Copy of the #2 General Order 25 was served upon the Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail. (pjh, )
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alnisa Bell on behalf of General Electric (GE) (Bell, Alnisa)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric (GE) identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company for General Electric (GE).. (Bell, Alnisa)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and sent to Shashi Mehrotra via regular mail along with a copy of the Local Rules and Pro Se Assistance Program Pamphlet. (pjh, )
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/18/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
March 22, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for General Electric (GE) answer due 3/28/2022. (pjh, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff in Schenectady County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schenectady County Supreme Court, case number 2022-169 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5844874) filed by General Electric (GE). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Declaration of Veronica Vron, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehrotra v. General Electric (GE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shashi Mehrotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric (GE)
Represented By: Alnisa Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?