Wright v. Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Eric Wright
Defendant: Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP and Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, Esq.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00515
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Redacted copy of the Amended In Forma Pauperis has been uploaded and attached to Docket #6 . The unredacted copy of the In Forma Pauperis is now permanently restricted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 5.2 and NYND Local Rule 5.2 (khr)
July 5, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Eric Wright regarding the #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Pro Se Party has submitted documents that are not in compliance with redaction requirements pursuant to Federal and NYND Local Rules 5.2 Personal Privacy Protection and General Order 22, Section 11.2. This document has been temporarily restricted. Pro Se Party is directed to make the appropriate redactions to the above referenced document and forward the redacted document to the Clerks office within 7 days of this notice. Failure to file a redacted document by the deadline will result in the unredacted document referenced above being unrestricted. Pro Se Party is cautioned that failure to redact these personal identifiers may subject them to the Courts full disciplinary power pursuant to NYND Local Rule 5.2. The name of the children are listed on the document Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/11/2022 (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 7/5/2022
July 1, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2022: #1 Redacted Amended In Forma Pauperis) (khr, ).
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (khr)(Mailed copy to pro se plaintiff on 5/18/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by Eric Wright. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se CM/ECF Registration Form) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Eric Wright at time complaint was filed on May 17, 2022. (khr)(Provided copies of documents, pro se hand book and local rules on 5/17/2022 to pro se plaintiff)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eric Wright (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, #2 Proposed summons as to Martin, Harding & Mazzotti) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (khr)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, Esq., Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP filed by Eric Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin, Harding and Mazzotti, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Anne Kazukenus, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?