SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. v. ESSE LOGISTICS LLC et al
Plaintiff: SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC.
Defendant: ESSE LOGISTICS LLC, ESSE TRUCKING LLC, ESSE TRANSPORT INC., National Indemnity Company, INTEGON INDEMNITY CORPORATION, NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE, ALLSTATE CORP., United Financial Casualty Company and Vanlisa Scott
Case Number: 1:2022cv00578
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Stipulations extending the time to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter. Dkt. Nos. #18 and #19 . The deadline in which Defendants, National Indemnity Company, ESSE LOGISTICS LLC, ESSE TRUCKING LLC, ESSE TRANSPORT INC. and Vanlisa Scott, are to file a response to the Complaint is extended to August 1, 2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/8/2022. (mab)
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by ESSE LOGISTICS LLC, ESSE TRANSPORT INC., ESSE TRUCKING LLC, Vanlisa Scott. (Perley, Michael)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation filed by National Indemnity Company. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2022 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjeev Devabhakthuni on behalf of National Indemnity Company (Devabhakthuni, Sanjeev)
June 21, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. answer due 7/6/2022. (pjh, )
June 20, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint served on Esse Transport on 6/15/2022, filed by SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC.. (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for United Financial Casualty Company answer due 7/6/2022. (pjh, )
June 16, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint served on United Financial Casualty Company c/o CT Corporation on 6/14/2022, filed by SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC.. (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Vanlisa Scott. (pjh, )
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Vanlisa Scott (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Intergon Indemnity Corporation, #2 Summons Issued as to Esse Logistics LLC, #3 Summons Issued as to Esse Trucking LLC, #4 Summons Issued as to Esse Transport Inc., #5 Summons Issued as to National Indemnity Company, #6 Summons Issued as to National General Insurance, #7 Summons Issued as to Allstate Corp)(pjh, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to INTEGON INDEMNITY CORPORATION (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to United Financial Casualty Company (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to ESSE LOGISTICS LLC (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to ALLSTATE CORP. (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to National Indemnity Company (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to ESSE TRUCKING LLC (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to ESSE TRANSPORT INC. (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to ESSE TRUCKING LLC (Segal, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 6/6/2022. (pjh, )
June 2, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney Jeffrey A. Segal's address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 6/6/2022. (pjh, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/23/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLSTATE CORP., ESSE LOGISTICS LLC, ESSE TRANSPORT INC., ESSE TRUCKING LLC, INTEGON INDEMNITY CORPORATION, NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE, National Indemnity Company, Vanlisa Scott and United Financial Casualty Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5921890) filed by SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC. v. ESSE LOGISTICS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAKER TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSE LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSE TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSE TRANSPORT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sanjeev Devabhakthuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGON INDEMNITY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanlisa Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?