Hardie et al v. City of Albany et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Hardie and Nathaniel Terrell, Sr.
Defendant: City of Albany, Albany Police Sergeant Sayre and Albany P.O. Scott C. Moran
Case Number: 1:2022cv00610
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Dkt. #15 Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers served on Nathaniel Terrell Sr. on 8/2/2022 filed by Thomas Hardie. (gmd, )
August 2, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the Dk #16 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss Pro Se party Nathaniel Terrell, Sr. has submitted an affidavit of service which did not include service to Pro Se plaintiff Thomas Hardie. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Pro Se Party has submitted an Affidavit of Service that is not in compliance with requirements pursuant to L. R. 5.1. Parties are reminded service should be made on ALL parties. Pro Se Party is directed to provide proof of service (re Dkt. #16 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss ) on Pro Se plaintiff Thomas Hardie with the Clerks office within 7 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/12/2022 (gmd, )
August 1, 2022 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss re Dkt. #13 ANSWER to Dkt. #1 COMPLAINT from Nathaniel Terrell, Sr. (gmd, )
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss re Dkt. #13 ANSWER to Dkt. #1 COMPLAINT from Thomas Hardie. (gmd, )
July 29, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the Dk #15 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss Pro Se party Thomas Hardie has submitted an affidavit of service which did not include service to Pro Se plaintiff Nathaniel Terrell Senior. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Pro Se Party has submitted an Affidavit of Service that is not in compliance with requirements pursuant to L. R. 5.1. Pro Se Party is directed to provide proof of service (re Dkt. # 15 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Affirmative Defense Answers and Motion to Deny/Dismiss ) on Pro Se plaintiff Nathaniel Terrell Senior with the Clerks office within 7 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 8/9/2022 (gmd, )
July 19, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT re #13 Answer to Complaint by City of Albany, Scott C. Moran, Sergeant Sayre. (Rehfuss, Stephen)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Albany, Scott C. Moran, Sergeant Sayre.(Rehfuss, Stephen)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail W. Rehfuss on behalf of City of Albany, Scott C. Moran, Sergeant Sayre (Rehfuss, Abigail)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Rehfuss on behalf of City of Albany, Scott C. Moran, Sergeant Sayre (Rehfuss, Stephen)
July 19, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the Dkt. #13 Answer to Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: An affidavit or certificate of service was not included with the Answer to the Complaint, counsel is directed to file proof of service on the docket within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/22/2022 (gmd, )
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to City of Albany, #1 Sergeant Sayre, and #2 Scott C. Moran.(gmd, )
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Dkt. #1 Complaint and Dkt. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: it is hereby ORDERED, that Plaintiff Terrells Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs Complaint be accepted for filing and that this case be allowed to proceed; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk shall forward Summonses and along with a packet containing General Order 25, which sets forth the Civil Case Management Plan used by the Northern District of New York, along with copies of the Complaint and this Order to the United States Marshal for service upon the Defendants; and it is further ORDERED, that a response to the Complaint be filed by Defendants or Defendants counsel as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure subsequent to service of process on Defendants; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk is directed to schedule a Rule 16 Conference before the assigned Magistrate Judge; and it is further ORDERED, that all motions shall comply with the Local Rules of Practice of the Northern District. In accordance with the Local Rules, Plaintiffs must promptly notify the Clerks Office and all parties or their counsel of any change in their address; the failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff in accordance with the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on July 1, 2022. (Copy served via regular mail)(gmd, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE returned signed as to Nathaniel Terrell, Sr. (gmd, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Albany, #1 Scott C. Moran, and #2 Sergeant Sayre(gmd, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/4/2022 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/27/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
June 17, 2022 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE (2) returned signed as to Thomas Hardie. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Notice 2) (gmd, )
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES, NOTICE mailed to both plaintiff Thomas Hardie and Nathaniel Terrell on 6/9/2022. (gmd, )
June 9, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ALB012460 (khr)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Thomas Hardie re Dkt. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dkt. #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gmd, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nathaniel Terrell, Sr (Attachments: #1 Proposed USM 285 Forms, #2 Proposed Summons as to Albany Police Officer Scott C. Moran, #3 Proposed Summons as to Albany Police Sergeant Sayre, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Envelope) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (gmd, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Albany, Scott C. Moran, Sergeant Sayre filed by Thomas Hardie, Nathaniel Terrell, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(gmd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardie et al v. City of Albany et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hardie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Terrell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albany
Represented By: Abigail W. Rehfuss
Represented By: Stephen J. Rehfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Police Sergeant Sayre
Represented By: Abigail W. Rehfuss
Represented By: Stephen J. Rehfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany P.O. Scott C. Moran
Represented By: Abigail W. Rehfuss
Represented By: Stephen J. Rehfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?