Bayer et al v. Nassau Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mark Bayer, Linda Bayer and Linda Atkins
Defendant: Nassau Life Insurance Company and Nassau Re
Case Number: 1:2022cv00694
Filed: June 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 17 COURT NOTICE of Conference (Change in Date/time): The Initial Conference is now reset for 10/13/2022 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/6/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The conference will be conducted by telephone and counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call.(tab)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER approving #15 Stipulation filed by Nassau Life Insurance Company. Answer deadline is extended to 9/18/2022. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/22/2022. (tab)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Nassau Life Insurance Company submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Lucks, Steven)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Joint Letter Motion from Steven M. Lucks, Esq. for Nassau Life Insurance Company requesting Joint Extension of Upcoming Deadlines : The answer deadline is extended and reset to 8/22/2022. The Initial Conference is adjourned and reset for 9/22/2022 @ 10:00 AM. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/15/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court). Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/20/2022. (tab)
July 20, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Nassau Life Insurance Company answer due 8/22/2022 (tab)
July 19, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #10 Certificate of Service to note that document is from State Court regarding service of Summons and Verified Complaint of the State Court action on 7/5/2022 (egr, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 13 Joint Letter Motion from Steven M. Lucks, Esq. for Nassau Life Insurance Company requesting Joint Extension of Upcoming Deadlines submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Lucks, Steven)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew R. Kasner, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/18/2022. (tab)
July 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dinnocenzo on behalf of Linda Atkins, Linda Bayer, Mark Bayer (Dinnocenzo, Eric)
July 18, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE State Court Document regarding service of Summons and Verified Complaint of the State Court action on 7/5/2022 by Linda Atkins, Linda Bayer, Mark Bayer (Dinnocenzo, Eric) Modified on 7/19/2022 (egr, ).
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew R. Kasner Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5966760. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Lucks, Steven)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nassau Life Insurance Company re #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, #1 Notice of Removal, #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 State Court Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service, #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Delivery Confirmation)(Lucks, Steven)
June 30, 2022 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nassau Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Nassau Companies of New York, Corporate Parent The Nassau Companies for Nassau Life Insurance Company.. (Lucks, Steven)
June 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Nassau Life Insurance Company and Nassau Re; Attorney Andrew R. Kasner, Email address is andrew.kasner@mhllp.com. Phone number is 713-333-5971. Admissions due by 7/14/2022. (egr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Mark Bayer, Linda Bayer, and Linda Atkins; Attorney Eric Dinnocenzo, Esq., Email address is eric@dinnocenzolaw.com. Phone number is 212-933-1675. Admissions due by 7/14/2022. (egr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/15/2022 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/8/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Copy e-mailed to Plaintiffs Counsel on 6/30/2022 (egr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in Supreme Court, State of New York: Rensselaer County. (egr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nassau Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (egr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of New York, Supreme Court: Rensselaer County, case number EF2022-271845 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5953035) filed by Nassau Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Unfiled Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer et al v. Nassau Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bayer
Represented By: Eric Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bayer
Represented By: Eric Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Atkins
Represented By: Eric Dinnocenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven M. Lucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau Re
Represented By: Steven M. Lucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?