Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Shadowbrook Farm LLC
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: Shadowbrook Farm LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00704
Filed: July 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Shadowbrook Farm LLC re #1 Complaint by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration)(DeSouza, Daniel)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. Shadowbrook Farm LLC served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (DeSouza, Daniel)
August 17, 2022 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prepared Food Photos, Inc.. (DeSouza, Daniel)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Initial Conference set for 10/3/2022 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/26/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) VA 2-055-131 (khr) (Copy mailed on 7/5/2022)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shadowbrook Farm LLC. (khr)
July 5, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Prepared Food Photos, Inc. regarding the #1 Complaint NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney address, phone number and/or email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 7/8/2022 (khr)
July 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Shadowbrook Farm LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5956035) filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Shadowbrook Farm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadowbrook Farm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?