Antonyuk et al v. Bruen
Plaintiff: Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation and Gun Owners of America New York, Inc.
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen
Amicus Curiae: National Police Association, Dr. Jaclyn Schildkraut, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Everytown for Gun Safety
Case Number: 1:2022cv00734
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT that, pursuant to the Decision and Order (Dkt. No. #48 ) issued on August 31, 2022 by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby, Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) is sua sponte DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject- matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3). Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (Dkt. No. #21 ) is DENIED without prejudice as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this action. All of the above pursuant to the Decision and Order dated August 31, 2022 issued by the Honorable Glenn T. Suddaby. Dkt. No. #48 . (sal)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECISION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) is sua sponte DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3}. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. #9 ) is denied without prejudice as moot. Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction (Dkt. No. #21 ) is denied without prejudice as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this action. Signed by Chief District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/31/2022. (sal )
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc. for proceedings held on 8/23/2022 before Judge Chief Judge Suddaby.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2022 before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby, Court Reporter: Jodi L. Hibbard, Telephone number: (315) 234-8547. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2022. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 8/30/2022 (jlh, )
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kevin P. Bruen for proceedings held on August 23, 2022 before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby.. (Thompson, James)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2022 re Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., and Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Plaintiffs' counsel calls Erich M. Pratt as a witness who appears via video through Microsoft Teams. Plaintiffs' counsel rests on Mr. Pratt's Declaration filed in this action. Attorney McCartin cross-examines this witness. Re-direct by Plaintiffs' counsel. 10:55 AM - Plaintiffs' counsel calls William Robinson as witness. Plaintiffs' counsel rests on Mr. Robinson's Declaration filed in this action. Attorney McCartin cross-examines this witness. Re-direct by Plaintiffs' counsel. 11:07 AM - Plaintiffs' counsel calls Ivan Antonyuk as a witness. Plaintiffs' counsel rests on Mr. Antonyuk's Affidavit filed in this action. Attorney McCartin cross-examines this witness. 11:19 AM - Plaintiffs' counsel intended to call Kevin Bruen as a witness, however, he is not present for today's proceeding. Defendant's counsel was previously advised by the Court that it is their decision as to whether or not Kevin Bruen should be present for this hearing. Chief Judge Suddaby notes that a subpoena can be issued for this witness to testify and today's hearing can be adjourned, however, Plaintiffs' counsel no longer requests Kevin Bruen's appearance. Oral argument is heard by Plaintiffs' counsel. 11:33 AM - Oral argument is heard by Defendant's counsel. 12:13 PM - Plaintiffs' counsel argues in reply to Defendant's argument. 12:12 PM - Defendant's counsel argues in reply to Plaintiffs' argument. 12:24 PM - Chief Judge Suddaby reserves decision and a written decision will be forthcoming. Court is adjourned. APP: Stephen Stamboulieh, Esq. for Plaintiffs. Michael McCartin, AAG & James Thompson, AAG for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jodi Hibbard) (sal)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Witness List by Kevin P. Bruen. (McCartin, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Exhibit List for 8/23/22 PI Hearing by Kevin P. Bruen. (McCartin, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Witness List by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #40 Plaintiff's Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Erich Pratt, #2 Declaration Declaration of William Robinson, #3 Declaration Declaration of Ivan Antonyuk)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 8/23/2022 to link to appropriate document (sal ).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to Defendant' Opposition to Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 8/23/2022 to change from a response to a reply (sal ).
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 **AMENDED TEXT ORDER** granting #36 Defendant's letter-motion for clarification. The Court hereby amends its Text Order of 08/18/2022 (Dkt. No. 34) so as to permit additional or supplemental declarations that regard ONLY the issues of standing or justiciability. Such declarations may also detail the fair traceability of Plaintiffs' alleged injuries to Defendant (as distinguishable from the factual allegations in Libertarian Party of Erie Cnty. v. Cuomo, 15-CV-0654, Amended Complaint, at Para. 123 [W.D.N.Y. filed Dec. 23, 2015]). In response to Defendant's challenge to the propriety of Plaintiff Antonyuk using a new declaration to "allege[ ] for the first time that [he] intends to violate a specific subsection of the CCIA," Defendant is respectfully advised that Plaintiff Antonyuk has already alleged what would happen if he were to carry his handgun into a gas station or store that is not specifically posted with a sign allowing him to carry there, the latter of which is something he "currently" does (Dkt. No. 1, at Para(s). 112, 114; Dkt. No. 1, Attach. 6, at Para(s). 14-18), and, as indicated in the Court's Text Order of 08/18/2022, he will indeed be able to further particularize allegations of fact supportive of his claims (e.g., by adducing additional declaration testimony regarding any intent he has to engage in conduct proscribed by the CCIA). Finally, Defendant is respectfully reminded that the brevity of time between the filing of Plaintiffs' reply and the hearing in this matter is due primarily to Defendant's own request for an extension of the deadline by which to file his opposition papers. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/19/2022. (kee)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Defendant's letter-motion for clarification. The Court hereby amends its Text Order of 08/18/2022 (Dkt. No. 34) so as to permit additional or supplemental declarations that regard ONLY the issues of standing or justiciability. In response to Defendant's challenge to the propriety of Plaintiff Antonyuk using a new declaration to "allege[ ] for the first time that [he] intends to violate a specific subsection of the CCIA," Defendant is respectfully advised that Plaintiff Antonyuk has already alleged what would happen if he were to carry his handgun into a gas station or store that is not specifically posted with a sign allowing him to carry there, the latter of which is something he "currently" does (Dkt. No. 1, at 112, 114; Dkt. No. 1, Attach. 6, at 14-18), and, as indicated in the Court's Text Order of 08/18/2022, he will indeed be able to further particularize allegations of fact supportive of his claims (e.g., by adducing additional declaration testimony regarding any intent he has to engage in conduct proscribed by the CCIA). Finally, Defendant is respectfully reminded that the brevity of time between the filing of Plaintiffs' reply and the hearing in this matter is due primarily to Defendant's own request for an extension of the deadline by which to file his opposition papers. SO ORDERED By Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/19/2022.(kee)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #35 letter-motion for an enlargement of the page limitation on their reply memorandum of law to FORTY (40) pages for the reasons stated therein. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/19/2022. (kee)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter Motion from James M. Thompson for Kevin P. Bruen requesting Clarification of August 18, 2022 Order Permitting Additional Standing-related Declarations submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Thompson, James)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed Letter Motion from Stephen D. Stamboulieh for Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc. requesting File Reply Not Exceeding 40 Pages submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs leave to file, along with their reply papers by the end of August 22, 2022, additional or supplemental declarations, including those detailing (1) any hours and resources spent by the organizational Plaintiffs handling communications from aggrieved members and supporters (and/or any anticipated loss of financial support and resulting interference with ability to function as organizations), and (2) any intent by Plaintiff Antonyuk in engage in conduct proscribed by the CCIA (e.g., carrying a concealed handgun into a gas station or store that is not specifically posted with a sign allowing him to carry there), assuming that such declarants are made available for cross-examination at the hearing on August 23, 2022. Additionally, the parties are directed to file any Witness Lists and Exhibit Lists by the end of Monday, August 22, 2022. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/18/2022. (sal)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMICUS BRIEF in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. (sal)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting Everytown for Gun Safety's #31 motion for leave to file an amicus brief for the reasons stated therein, and directing the Clerk of Court to file Dkt. No. #31 , Attach. 1 as that amicus brief. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/18/2022. (sal )
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Everytown for Gun Safety. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief) (Lefkowitz, Alla)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMICUS BRIEF in Support of Defendant's Opposition to the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (sal)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 the Giffords Law Center's motion for leave to file an amicus brief to the extent it is relevant to the public-interest prong of the standard governing Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, and directing the Clerk of Court to file Dkt. No. #28 , Attach. 1 as that amicus brief. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/17/2022. (sal )
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Leff, Andrew)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMICUS BRIEF in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dr. Jaclyn Schildkraut, Ph.D.. (sal)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting Dr. Jacklyn Schildkraut's #25 motion for leave to file an amicus brief to the extent it is relevant to the public-interest prong of the standard governing Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, and directing the Clerk of Court to file Dkt. No. #25 , Attach. 1 as that amicus brief. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/17/2022. (sal)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae filed by Dr. Jaclyn Schildkraut, Ph.D. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Elmore, John)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMICUS BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' Prayers for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by National Police Association. (sal )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 the NPA's motion for leave to file an amicus brief for the reasons stated therein, and directing the Clerk of Court to file Dkt. No. #22 , Attach. 1 as that amicus brief. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/16/2022. (sal )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File filed by National Police Association. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex 1 Brief of Amicus Curiae) (Lennon, John)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Kevin P. Bruen. Motion returnable before Judge Suddaby Response to Motion due by 9/6/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. McCartin, #2 Exhibit(s) A (Bill Sponsor Memo for CCIA), #3 Exhibit(s) B (PP-3 Form), #4 Memorandum of Law) (McCartin, Michael)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Declaration of James M. Thompson filed by Kevin P. Bruen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - State Senate Sponsor Memo, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Feb. 2007 Pistol License Application, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - 1648 Massachusetts General Court Order, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - 1763 Pennsylvania Law On Selling Guns to Native Americans, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - 1642 Virginia Law On Selling Guns to Native Americans, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - 1707 South Carolina Law on Selling Guns to Native Americans, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - 1637 Massachusetts Law Disarming Named Followers of Dissident Preacher, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - English Militia Act of 1662, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - 1688 English Act Disarming Papists, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - 1756 Virginia Act Disarming Papists, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - 1776 Massachusetts Act Disarming Persons Disaffected to the Cause of America, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - 1777 Pennsylvania Act Obliging Assurances of Allegiance, #13 Exhibit(s) 13 - 1777 Maryland Act For the Better Security of the Government, #14 Exhibit(s) 14 - 1777 North Carolina Act Preventing the Dangers Which May Arise From Persons Disaffected to the State, #15 Exhibit(s) 15 - 1777 Virginia Act Obliging Assurances of Allegiance, #16 Exhibit(s) 16 - 1776 Resolution of the New York Committee of Safety, #17 Exhibit(s) 17 - 1792 Federal Militia Act, #18 Exhibit(s) 18 - 1775 Massachusetts Militia Act, #19 Exhibit(s) 19 - 1778 New Jersey Militia Act, #20 Exhibit(s) 20 - 1785 Virginia Militia Act, #21 Exhibit(s) 21 - 1786 New York Militia Act, #22 Exhibit(s) 22 - 1780 New York Militia Act, #23 Exhibit(s) 23 - 1782 New York Militia Act, #24 Exhibit(s) 24 - 1806 New Jersey Militia Act, #25 Exhibit(s) 25 - 1822 Pennsylvania Militia Act, #26 Exhibit(s) 26 - 1892 Federal Act to Punish the Carrying or Selling of Deadly or Dangerous Weapons Within the District of Columbia, #27 Exhibit(s) 27 - 1881 New York City Pistol Licensing Law, #28 Exhibit(s) 28 - 1878 New York City Proceedings Adopting Pistol Licensing Law, #29 Exhibit(s) 29 - 1880 Ohio Act to Suppress Tramps, #30 Exhibit(s) 30 - 1879 Tennessee Act Forbidding Carrying Pistols, #31 Exhibit(s) 31 - 1876 Wyoming Act Prohibiting Firearms Within A City, Town, or Village, #32 Exhibit(s) 32 - 1881 Arkansas Act to Preserve the Public Peace and Prevent Crime, #33 Exhibit(s) 33 - 1871 Texas Act to Regulate the Keeping and Bearing of Deadly Weapons, #34 Exhibit(s) 34 - Application for a Pennsylvania License to Carry Firearms, #35 Exhibit(s) 35 - 2022 Interim Report of the Texas House Investigative Committee on the Robb Elementary Shooting, #36 Exhibit(s) 36 - Florida Law Enforcement Report on Parkland Shooter's Troubling Behavior, #37 Exhibit(s) 37 - 1776 Delaware Constitution Forbidding Arms at Elections, #38 Exhibit(s) 38 - 1786 Virginia Law Forbidding Arms in Fairs or Markets, #39 Exhibit(s) 39 - 1824 UVA Board Minutes Banning Weapons at the University, #40 Exhibit(s) 40 - 1861 Board of Commissioners Report Including Ban on Guns in Central Park, #41 Exhibit(s) 41 - 1870 Texas Law Prohibiting Weapons in Vulnerable Places, #42 Exhibit(s) 42 - 1883 Missouri Law Prohibiting Weapons in Vulnerable Places, #43 Exhibit(s) 43 - 1869 Tennessee Law Prohibiting Weapons in Fairs or Public Assemblies, #44 Exhibit(s) 44 - 1870 Georgia Law Prohibiting Wseapon In Vulnerable Places, #45 Exhibit(s) 45 - 1873 Pennsylvania Law Prohibiting Weapons in City of Harrisburg, #46 Exhibit(s) 46 - 1721 Pennsylvania Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #47 Exhibit(s) 47 - 1741 New Jersey Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #48 Exhibit(s) 48 - 1715 Maryland Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #49 Exhibit(s) 49 - 1771 New Jersey Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #50 Exhibit(s) 50 - 1866 Texas Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #51 Exhibit(s) 51 - 1893 Oregon Law Prohibiting Carrying Guns on Others' Private Property, #52 Exhibit(s) 52 - Von Steuben's Regulations for the Order and Discipline of the Troops of the United States, #53 Exhibit(s) 53 - Liber Albus: the White Book of the City of London, #54 Exhibit(s) 54 - Treatise of the Pleas of the Crown)(Thompson, James)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby filed by Kevin P. Bruen. (Thompson, James)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 letter-motion from James M. Thompson for Kevin P. Bruen requesting permission to file a 65-page memorandum of law in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion #9 for a preliminary injunction. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/11/2022. (sal)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Olson on behalf of Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Olson, Robert)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter Motion from James M. Thompson for Kevin P. Bruen requesting Leave To File Excess Pages submitted to Judge Chief Judge Suddaby . (Thompson, James)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #14 letter-motion requesting an extension of time to respond to the Complaint on or before August 15, 2022. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/4/2022. (sal )
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Kevin P. Bruen requesting more time to respond to the Complaint with an Answer or a Motion submitted to Judge Suddaby . (McCartin, Michael)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE re Motion #9 for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., and Gun Owners of America, Inc.: An In-Person Motion Hearing is set for 8/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (sal)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Thompson on behalf of Kevin P. Bruen (Thompson, James)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendant's letter-motion for an extension of the deadline by which he must respond to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Although Defendant certainly must (as he argues) review "extensive" history to brief the Court on the relevant historical traditions in his response, he has already gotten a head start in amassing the necessary historical sources in N.Y. State Rifle & Pistol Assoc., Inc. v. Bruen, 18-CV-0134 (N.D.N.Y.). Moreover, although Plaintiffs did not also file a motion for emergency relief in the form of a Temporary Restraining Order, the law they challenge does take effect on September 1, 2022: the Court could not grant Defendant the full extension he seeks without shortening (1) the seven-day period for Plaintiffs' reply, (2) the time afforded the Court to review that reply before the hearing, (3) the window of time in which to hold the hearing, and (4) the time afforded the Court (between the hearing and September 1, 2022) to prepare a Decision and Order. In short, the complete relief that Defendant seeks in his letter-motion would deprive Plaintiffs of their right to have their motion for a preliminary injunction fairly and justly decided, if not the very relief they are seeking. As a result, the deadline for Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' motion is extended five days to the end of MONDAY, AUGUST 15, 2022; and the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply is extended five days to the end of MONDAY, AUGUST 22, 2022. Defendant is respectfully advised that the partial granting of his letter-motion is contingent on him making himself available for an in-person hearing at any point between TUESDAY, AUGUST 23, 2022, and the end of FRIDAY, AUGUST 26, 2022. A Decision and Order on Plaintiffs' motion will be issued before the statute in question takes effect on September 1, 2022. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/21/2022. (sal )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Kevin P. Bruen requesting more time to respond to the motion for a preliminary injunction submitted to Judge Suddaby filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Kevin P. Bruen requesting more time to respond to the motion for a preliminary injunction submitted to Judge Suddaby . (McCartin, Michael)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Motion returnable before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 8/10/2022. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law) (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation. Kevin P. Bruen served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Proof of Service on Attorney General)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gun Owners of America New York, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gun Owners Foundation. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Ivan Antonyuk, et al.; Attorney Robert J. Olson, William J. Olson, Email address is wjo@mindspring.com. Phone number is 703-356-5070. Notice emailed on 7/12/2022. Admissions due by 7/26/2022. (egr)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2022 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/4/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kevin P. Bruen. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Kevin Bruen c/o Attorney General Letitia James)(egr)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin P. Bruen (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5963145) filed by Ivan Antonyuk, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners of America New York, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Concealed Carry Improvement Act Text, #2 Exhibit 2: Gun Control Bill Memo, #3 Exhibit 3: Redlines SB51001, #4 Exhibit 4: Declaration of Erich Pratt, #5 Exhibit 5: Declaration of William Robinson, #6 Exhibit 6: Declaration of Ivan Antonyuk, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonyuk et al v. Bruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Antonyuk
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Represented By: Robert J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Represented By: Robert J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Represented By: Robert J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America New York, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Represented By: Robert J. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen
Represented By: James M. Thompson
Represented By: Michael G. McCartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Police Association
Represented By: John C. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dr. Jaclyn Schildkraut
Represented By: John V. Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Andrew Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Alla Lefkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?