New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. et al v. Bruen et al
Plaintiff: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, Thomas Stirnweis, Wayne Francis, Khourly Porter and Scott Noren
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr., Rodney K. Harrison and Patrick J. Ryder
Case Number: 1:2022cv00907
Filed: August 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Patrick J. Ryder.(Scott, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Scott on behalf of Patrick J. Ryder (Scott, Andrew)
October 28, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #22 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - the document is not signed. The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 11/2/2022. (pjh, )
October 27, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Scott on behalf of Patrick J. Ryder (Scott, Andrew)
October 26, 2022 TEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/26/2022 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by James Porter, III, Esq., John Sweeney, Esq., and Marc Nardone, Esq. for the Plaintiff; Michael McCartin, AAG and Shannan Krasnokutski, AAG for defendants; Judge D'Agostino addresses the defendant's request for leave to file a motion to dismiss; Counsel for the defendant and counsel for the plaintiff address the Court; The Court will permit the defendant to file a motion to dismiss - the Motion is due on or before 11/16/22; The response and reply deadlines will be set upon filing of the motion to dismiss - the motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino, CRD Britney Norton [Time 11:01 a.m. - 11:20 a.m.]) (ban)
October 21, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Wayne Francis, Brandon Koch, Robert Nash, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Scott Noren, Khourly Porter, Thomas Stirnweis re #20 LETTER BRIEF Pre-Motion Response Per Rules of Practice (Sweeney, John)
October 18, 2022 Filing 20 LETTER BRIEF (Pre-motion letter per Rules of Practice) by Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service via ECF)(Krasnokutski, Shannan)
October 18, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Collier Krasnokutski on behalf of Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr. (Krasnokutski, Shannan)
October 12, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis. Rodney K. Harrison served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Sweeney, John)
October 12, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis. Patrick J. Ryder served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. (Sweeney, John)
October 7, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis. Richard J. McNally, Jr. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Sweeney, John)
October 7, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis. Kevin P. Bruen served on 10/3/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Sweeney, John)
October 7, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. McCartin on behalf of Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr. (McCartin, Michael)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Rodney K. Harrison, #1 Patrick J. Ryder, #2 Kevin P. Bruen, and #3 Richard J. McNally.(gmd, )
September 29, 2022 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Richard J. McNally, Jr. re: #8 Amended Complaint. (Sweeney, John)
September 29, 2022 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Thomas Stirnweis, Robert Nash, Brandon Koch, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Khourly Porter, Scott Noren, Wayne Francis is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Kevin P. Bruen re: #8 Amended Complaint. (Sweeney, John)
September 28, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Robert Nash, Brandon Koch is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Patrick J. Ryder re: #8 Amended Complaint. (Sweeney, John)
September 28, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Robert Nash, Brandon Koch is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Rodney K. Harrison re: #8 Amended Complaint. (Sweeney, John)
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr. filed by New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Robert Nash, Brandon Koch.(Sweeney, John)
September 20, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (egr, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/1/22. (lmw)
September 1, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER denying Direct Assignment. The cases are not related, and the Clerk is directed to randomly reassign the case. So Ordered by U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/1/22. (lmw)
September 1, 2022 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/30/2022 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kevin P. Bruen. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Richard J. McNally)(khr)
September 1, 2022 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:22-cv-734. (khr)
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. (khr)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin P. Bruen, Richard J. McNally, Jr. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6018381) filed by New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Robert Nash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. et al v. Bruen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc.
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nash
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Koch
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stirnweis
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Francis
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khourly Porter
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Noren
Represented By: Connor McCarthy Blair
Represented By: James W. Porter, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: Marc A. Nardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen
Represented By: Michael G. McCartin
Represented By: Shannan Collier Krasnokutski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. McNally, Jr.
Represented By: Michael G. McCartin
Represented By: Shannan Collier Krasnokutski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney K. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Ryder
Represented By: Andrew R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?