Vickers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Perry Vickers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv00527
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy and Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. Parties have not consented. Authorized by the Chief Judge pursuant to General Order #18. (drm)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re 5 Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner. Administrative Transcript deadline terminated. Previously set for August 7, 2023 at the Initial Notice of Appearance filing. (khr)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Victoria S. Treanor appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Modified on 5/11/2023 (khr).
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Geoffrey M. Peters appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 8/7/2023. (Peters, Geoffrey)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 5/19/2023. (khr)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (khr)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6278261). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Vickers
Represented By: Steven R. Dolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Peters
Represented By: Victoria S. Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?