State National Insurance Company, Inc. v. Kenwood Commons, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Guild Ventures, LLC, Kenwood Commons, LLC, Jacob Frydman, TBG Funding LLC and Guild Investment Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01152
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Jacob Frydman on 10/30/2023, filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bresee, Dianne)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER approving #20 Stipulation, filed by Guild Ventures, LLC. Answer due date updated for Guild Ventures, LLC: answer due 11/17/2023. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/23/2023. (tab)
October 19, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Set/Reset Answer Deadline by Guild Ventures, LLC submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Approving Stipulation Extending Time of Guild Ventures, LLC to Respond to Complaint)(Besikof, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for Guild Ventures, LLC answer due 10/11/2023; Kenwood Commons, LLC answer due 10/26/2023; TBG Funding LLC answer due 10/11/2023. (hmr)
October 17, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Kenwood Commons on 10/05/2023, filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bresee, Dianne)
October 3, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on TBG Funding LLC on 09/20/2023, filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bresee, Dianne)
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Guild Ventures, LLC f/k/a Guild Investment on 09/20/2023, filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Bresee, Dianne)
September 18, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Chadwick Gauntt on behalf of State National Insurance Company, Inc. (Gauntt, John)
September 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William C. Surber on behalf of State National Insurance Company, Inc. (Surber, William)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Christopher Surber, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/15/2023. (tab)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chadwick Gauntt, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/15/2023. (tab)
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Cert. of good standing)(Bresee, Dianne)
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Corrected/Redacted Document(s) flattened pdf of form, #2 Corrected/Redacted Document(s))(Bresee, Dianne)
September 14, 2023 Filing 10 Supplemental Admission documents re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Corrected/Redacted Document(s) flattened pdf of form)(Bresee, Dianne)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 Summonses Issued as to Jacob Frydman, Guild Ventures, LLC, Kenwood Commons, LLC, TBG Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Jacob Frydman, #2 Summons Issued for TBG Funding LLC, #3 Summons Issued for Guild Ventures, LLC)(hmr)
September 14, 2023 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Gauntt and #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Surber. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully executed New Attorney E-filing Registration Form signed and dated by the applicant; a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; documents of letters issued by a State Bar or a Bar Association are not acceptable proof of good standing. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
September 13, 2023 Filing 8 Supplemental Admission documents re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Corrected/Redacted Document(s), #2 Corrected/Redacted Document(s))(Bresee, Dianne)
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 Supplemental Admission documents re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Corrected/Redacted Document(s), #2 Corrected/Redacted Document(s))(Bresee, Dianne)
September 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Christopher Surber Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6443713. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bresee, Dianne)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Chadwick Gauntt Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6443668. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bresee, Dianne)
September 13, 2023 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William C. Surber. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully executed New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
September 13, 2023 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John C. Gauntt. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully executed New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): State National Insurance Company, Inc. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Jacob Frydman, Guild Ventures, LLC, Kenwood Commons, LLC, TBG Funding LLC re: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bresee, Dianne)
September 11, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to State National Insurance Company, Inc. regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. CIVIL COVER SHEET IS MISSING - Please file this document into this case by using the the event - Notice - Other found under - Civil - Notice - Notice-Other - you can then add to the docket text - Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/14/2023 (hmr)
September 11, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to State National Insurance Company, Inc. regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/14/2023. (hmr)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney John Chadwick Gauntt, Email address is chad.gauntt@gkbklaw.com. Phone number is 281-367-6555; and Attorney W. Chris Surber, Email address is chris.surber@gkbklaw.com. Phone number is 281-367-6555. [Copy of this notice was emailed to both attorneys, along with a copy of the General Order #25 on 9/8/2023.] Admissions due by 9/22/2023. (hmr)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/1/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [A courtesy copy of this document was emailed to Attorney Gaunt and Attorney Surber via email on 9/8/2023.](hmr)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Declaratory Judgment Relief against Jacob Frydman, Guild Ventures, LLC, Kenwood Commons, LLC, TBG Funding LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6439089) filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Insurance, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Foreclosure Judgment, #4 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy Petition, #5 Exhibit E - Foreclosure Action - Surplus Monies)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State National Insurance Company, Inc. v. Kenwood Commons, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guild Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenwood Commons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Frydman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBG Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guild Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dianne C. Bresee
Represented By: William C. Surber
Represented By: John Chadwick Gauntt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?