Steele v. Saratoga County, New York et al
Plaintiff: Alice Steele
Defendant: Saratoga County, New York, Andrew Jarosh and State of New York
Case Number: 1:2023cv01615
Filed: December 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Violation 5th & 8th Amendme
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald P. Friedberg on behalf of Alice Steele (Friedberg, Ronald)
January 23, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by R. Scott Heasley on behalf of Alice Steele (Heasley, R.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Turner on behalf of Alice Steele (Turner, Peter)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Heasley. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/22/2024. (sg)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald Friedberg Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/22/2024. (sg )
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Turner. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/22/2024. (sg)
January 18, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Scott Heasley Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6583838. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 18, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ronald P. Friedberg Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6583819. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 18, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Turner Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6583780. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 16, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Brickman on behalf of Alice Steele (Brickman, Patrick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shmuel S Kleinman on behalf of Alice Steele (Kleinman, Shmuel)
January 16, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick J. Perotti on behalf of Alice Steele (Perotti, Patrick)
January 16, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Bartela on behalf of Alice Steele (Bartela, Frank)
January 16, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole T. Fiorelli on behalf of Alice Steele (Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shmuel Kleinman. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2024. (sg)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole Fiorelli. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2024. (sg )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank Bartela Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2024. (sg )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Perotti. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2024. (sg)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Brickman. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/10/2024. (sg)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 Supplemental Admission documents re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Cole, Steven)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Supplemental Admission documents re: #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Cole, Steven)
January 10, 2024 Filing 14 Supplemental Admission documents re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Cole, Steven)
January 10, 2024 Filing 13 Supplemental Admission documents re: #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Cole, Steven)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY]. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shmuel Shmelke Kleinman Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6571960. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole T. Fiorelli Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6571956. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank A. Bartela Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6571947. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Joseph Perotti Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6571934. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Brickman Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6571908. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney E-filing Registration Form - Patrick J. Brickman, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Patrick J. Brickman, #5 Proposed Order for Attorney Admission) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Cole, Steven)
January 9, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Perotti. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission form. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
January 9, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shmuel S. Kleinman. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission form. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
January 9, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank Bartela. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission form. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
January 9, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole T. Fiorelli. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission form. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
January 9, 2024 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick J. Brickman. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission form. The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (mmg)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Alice Steele; Attorney Patrick J. Perotti, Nicole T. Fiorelli, Frank A. Bartela, Patrick J. Brickman, Shmuel S. Kleinman, Email address is pperotti@dworkenlaw.com, nfiorelli@dworkenlaw.com, fbartela@dworkenlaw.com, pbrickman@dworkenlaw.com, Skleinman@dworkenlaw.com. Phone number is (440) 352-3391. Served via email along with GO25 Admissions due by 1/9/2024. (mmg).
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Alice Steele; Attorney Ronald P. Friedberg, Email address is rfriedberg@meyersroman.com. Phone number is (216)831-0042. Served via email along with GO 25. Admissions due by 1/9/2024. (mmg).
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/18/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg).
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Jarosh, Saratoga County, New York, State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Saratoga County, New York, #2 Summons Issued as to State of New York).(mmg)
December 22, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Andrew Jarosh, Saratoga County, New York, State of New York (Filing fee $405 receipt number BNYNDC-6556511) filed by Alice Steele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Owner List., #2 Exhibit B: Order and Judgment, #3 Exhibit C: Clerk Recording Page., #4 Exhibit D: Daily Gazette Page, #5 Exhibit E: Indenture, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Saratoga County, New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Steele
Represented By: Steven E. Cole
Represented By: Frank Bartela
Represented By: Nicole T. Fiorelli
Represented By: Patrick Brickman
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Peter Turner
Represented By: R. Scott Heasley
Represented By: Ronald P. Friedberg
Represented By: Shmuel S Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saratoga County, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Jarosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?