Angurala v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Plaintiff: Vikram Angurala
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America and Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady
Case Number: 1:2024cv00409
Filed: March 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hyundai Motor America identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motor America.. (Gregg, Michael)
April 19, 2024 Filing 11 Amended Certificate of Service for ANSWER to Complaint by Hyundai Motor America.(Gregg, Michael)
April 19, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Motor America.(Gregg, Michael)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Pro Se Motion for Permission to File Electronically in ECF, via PACER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #7 request for permission to electronically file documents via CM/ECF. Since Plaintiff has filed a certification as directed showing that Plaintiff is in compliance with the Court's requirements, permission is granted for Plaintiff to participate in electronic case filing in this case only. Plaintiff is authorized to conduct N.D.N.Y. CM/ECF filing via a PACER account in ONLY this case. Plaintiff must not permit anyone else to utilize their PACER account. Plaintiff must comply with all N.D.N.Y. Local Rules, all Federal Rules, all General Orders of the N.D.N.Y., and all Court Orders, directives, and practices. Plaintiff must comply with all directives issued by the Clerk of Court to Plaintiff in connection with any filing on CM/ECF as to which the Clerks Office contacts Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised and cautioned that any violation of any condition or any abuse otherwise of participation in electronic case filing will result in the immediate revocation of plaintiff participating in electronic case filing. Additionally, the court may revoke these electronic filing privileges if it determines in its sole discretion that plaintiff's use of the system is not satisfactory. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/17/2024. (Copy served via regular mail on 4/17/2024)(tab)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 PROOF of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady on 03/26/2024, filed by Vikram Angurala. [Filed via MFT on 3/28/2024.] (hmr)
March 28, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady answer due 4/16/2024. (hmr)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to File Electronically in ECF filed by Vikram Angurala. [Filed via MFT on 3/27/2024.] Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (hmr)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 PROOF of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hyundai Motor America on 03/26/2024, filed by Vikram Angurala. [Filed via MFT on 3/27/2024.] [Same as Dkt. No. 5, just includes the summons as page 1.] (hmr)
March 27, 2024 ***Answer due date updated for Hyundai Motor America answer due 4/16/2024. (hmr)
March 26, 2024 Filing 5 PROOF of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hyundai Motor America on 03/26/2024, filed by Vikram Angurala. [Filed via MFT on 3/26/2024.] (hmr)
March 25, 2024 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Vikram Angurala on 3/25/2024, along with the Local Rules. (hmr)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/17/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
March 25, 2024 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Hyundai Motor America, Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady. (hmr)
March 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hyundai Motor America, Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady (Filing fee $405 receipt number 27D0RMRL) filed by Vikram Angurala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) [Filed via MFT on 3/25/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angurala v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikram Angurala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Michael J. Gregg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews Hyundai of Schenectady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?