Bulson v. Town of Brunswick et al
Plaintiff: Charles J. Bulson
Defendant: Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals, Charles Golden, Philip H. Herrington, Andrew W. Gilchrist, Tom Cioffi, Herrington Farms, INC and Kenneth H. Herrington
Case Number: 1:2024cv00503
Filed: April 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Olivia G. Reinhardt on behalf of Tom Cioffi, Charles Golden, Philip H. Herrington, Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals (Reinhardt, Olivia)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #19 Letter Request, requesting Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/13/2024.(gmd)
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Andrew W. Gilchrist.(Ferrara, Paul)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Letter Motion from Paul G. Ferrara for Andrew W. Gilchrist requesting Extension of Time to Answer submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Ferrara, Paul)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul G. Ferrara on behalf of Andrew W. Gilchrist (Ferrara, Paul)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kenneth H. Herrington, Herrington Farms, INC.(Bush, Scott)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion requesting an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Answer due date updated for Tom Cioffi answer due 6/17/2024; Charles Golden answer due 6/17/2024; Philip H. Herrington answer due 6/17/2024; Town of Brunswick answer due 6/17/2024; Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals answer due 6/17/2024. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/3/2024. (gmd, )
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter Motion for Charles J. Bulson requesting in response to Defendants' request to Answer by June 17th submitted to Judge Stewart . (Toporowski, Matthew)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter Motion from April J. Laws, Esq. for Tom Cioffi, Charles Golden, Philip H. Herrington, Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals requesting an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (ECF No. 1) to Monday, June 17, 2024 submitted to Judge Stewart . (Laws, April)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by April J. Laws on behalf of Tom Cioffi, Charles Golden, Philip H. Herrington, Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals (Laws, April)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott W. Bush on behalf of Kenneth H. Herrington, Herrington Farms, INC (Bush, Scott)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Tom Cioffi answer due 5/6/2024; Andrew W. Gilchrist answer due 5/6/2024; Charles Golden answer due 5/6/2024; Kenneth H. Herrington answer due 5/6/2024; Philip H. Herrington answer due 5/6/2024; Herrington Farms, INC answer due 5/6/2024; Town of Brunswick answer due 5/6/2024; Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals answer due 5/6/2024. (egr)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kenneth H. Herrington on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Herrington Farms, Inc. on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Gilchrist on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Tom Cioffi on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Phillip H. Herrington on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Charles Golden on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Town of Brunswick ZBA on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Town of Brunswick on April 15, 2024, filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Toporowski, Matthew)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/10/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sbb)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tom Cioffi, Andrew W. Gilchrist, Charles Golden, Kenneth H. Herrington, Philip H. Herrington, Herrington Farms, INC, Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 as to Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals, #2 as to Charles Golden, #3 as to Philip Herrington, #4 as to Andrew Gilchrist, #5 as to Tom Cioffi, #6 as to Herrington Farms, #7 as to Kenneth Herrington)(sbb)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tom Cioffi, Andrew W. Gilchrist, Charles Golden, Kenneth H. Herrington, Philip H. Herrington, Herrington Farms, INC, Town of Brunswick, Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6691803) filed by Charles J. Bulson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bulson v. Town of Brunswick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Bulson
Represented By: Matthew A. Toporowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Brunswick
Represented By: April J. Laws
Represented By: Olivia G. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Brunswick Zoning Board of Appeals
Represented By: Olivia G. Reinhardt
Represented By: April J. Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Golden
Represented By: Olivia G. Reinhardt
Represented By: April J. Laws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip H. Herrington
Represented By: April J. Laws
Represented By: Olivia G. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. Gilchrist
Represented By: Paul G. Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cioffi
Represented By: April J. Laws
Represented By: Olivia G. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrington Farms, INC
Represented By: Scott W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth H. Herrington
Represented By: Scott W. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?