Universal Instruments Corporation v. Micro System Engineering, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Instruments Corporation
Defendant: Micro System Engineering, Inc. and Missouri Tooling & Automation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00831
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Binghamton Office
County: Broome
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 SUMMARY ORDER - That Universal's 436 motion to stay is DENIED AS MOOT. That defendants' 440 and 441 motions for attorneys' fees are DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 5/1/2020. (jel, )
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER - That the motion, (Dkt. No. 432), is GRANTED and: 1. The supersedeas bond proffered by plaintiff, in the amount of $3,382,685.08, secured by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company as surety of plaintiff as principal is APPROVED and 2. Exe cution upon the Orders entering judgments of costs and attorney's fees in favor of defendants dated February 7, 2018 and June 4, 2018 (Dkt. Nos. 421,426) are STAYED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62(d) pending disposition of plaintiff's appeal from the Court's Order of August 8, 2017 (Dkt. No. 396) granting judgment in favor of Defendants before the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/7/2018. (jel, )
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 426 SUMMARY ORDER - That attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,008,990.92 are imposed against Universal. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 6/4/2018. (jel, )
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SUMMARY ORDER - That defendants' motions for attorneys' fees and costs (Dkt. Nos. 410-412) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: GRANTED with respect to an award of attorneys' fees in an amount to be determined and costs in the amount to be determined and costs in the amount of $38,247.89. DENIED in all other respects. That defendants are directed to file papers related to the requested amount of attorneys' fees award on or before February 23, 2018 and plaintiff may file a response seven days thereafter. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/7/2018. (jel, )
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 SUMMARY ORDER - That MSEI and MTA's motions for judgment as a matter of law (Dkt. Nos. 391-93) are GRANTED. That the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of MSEI and MTA. That the Clerk close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/8/2017. (jel, )
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SUMMARY ORDER - That MSEI and MTA's 230 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/11/2017. (jel, )
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - ORDERED that MSEI and MTA's motion to strike (Dkt. No. 107) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that MSEI and MTAs motion for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. No. 80) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED I N PART as follows: GRANTED with respect to claims of unjust enrichment, unfair competition, and promissory estoppel against MSEI; and DENIED in all other respects; and it is further ORDERED that MSEI and MTA's motion to dism iss (Dkt. No. 97) is DENIED AS MOOT; and it is further ORDERED that MSEI and MTA's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 196) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that Universal's cross motion for partial summar y judgment (Dkt. No. 209) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED with respect to MSEI's complaint in the member case; and it is further DENIED in all other respects; and it is further ORDERED that MSEI's complaint (Dkt. No. 1, 3:13-cv-1144) in the member case is DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that this case is deemed trial ready and the court, in due course, shall issue a trial scheduling order; and it is f urther ORDERED that the parties shall advise the court of their joint position regarding sealing within seven (7) days of the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order. In particular, the joint submission shall address whether the parties are of the opinion that sealing is required, if so, why, and whether a redacted version of the Memorandum-Decision and Order, and precisely what those redactions would be, can be made available to the public; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk provide a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order to the parties. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/24/2017. (jel, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That defendant's 16 Motion to Set Aside Default is GRANTED. That Universal's 13 Motion for default judgment is DENIED as moot. That defendants shall file appropriate responsive pleadings or motions wi thin fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum-Decision and Order. That the parties notify Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles in order to schedule further proceedings in accordance with this Memorandum-Decision and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/14/2014. (jel, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Instruments Corporation v. Micro System Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Instruments Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan M. Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro System Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Tooling & Automation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?