Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LLC v. SupplyCore Inc.
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LLC
Defendant: SupplyCore Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00835
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Binghamton Office
County: Broome
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECISION & ORDER: Defendant SupplyCore Inc. is GRANTED default judgment against plaintiff Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LLC in the amount of $290,087.16, and awarded prejudgment interest in the amount of 9% per annum from March 4, 2015 to the date of entry of judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 6/12/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified)(khr)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECISION & ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 85 . Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the Report, Recommendation, and Order [dkt. # 85] for the reasons stated therein. Thus, (1) All claims asserted by Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LL C (Comprehensive) in its Second Amended Complaint against SupplyCore, Inc. ("SupplyCore") are DISMISSED; (2) Comprehensive is deemed to be in default with respect to SupplyCore's counterclaims, and the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter Comprehensive's default with respect to those counterclaims; and (3) The matter is set down for further proceedings regarding damages in connection with SupplyCore's counterclaims against Comprehensive. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court, in consultation with SupplyCore's counsel, to schedule a hearing for the purpose of determining these damages. In anticipation of this hearing, SupplyCore's counsel is directed to file, thirty (30) days in advance of the he aring, any competent evidence that may enable the Court to determine, with reasonable certainty, the amount due by Comprehensive for damages on some or all of the counterclaims. If the additional information is sufficient and unopposed, the Court m ay decide the amount of damages on the basis of the written submissions alone. If the evidence is opposed and/or insufficient, the Court will proceed with the hearing to determine these damages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on June 21, 2017. (khr)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DECISION and ORDER. CMA's motion to dismiss Supply Core's counterclaims, Dkt. No. 41 , is DENIED. Signed by Senior District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 8/23/2016. (lah)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECISION and ORDER. Defendant's motion and renewed motion to stay the case and dissolve the temporary restraining order or in the alternative to dismiss or transfer venue to the Northern District of Illinois, Dkt. Nos. 14 , 24 , are DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/29/2016. (lah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LLC v. SupplyCore Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Manufacturing Associates, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SupplyCore Inc.
Represented By: John R. Canney, IV
Represented By: Emily A. Constantine
Represented By: Jessica A. Desany
Represented By: William E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?