Smith v. Pines et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Smith |
Defendant: |
Spero Pines, Ronald Lanouette, John Tkach and Ticia Eaves |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00286 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Binghamton Office |
County: |
Broome |
Presiding Judge: |
David E. Peebles |
Presiding Judge: |
Glenn T. Suddaby |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 22, 2019 |
Filing
57
DECISION AND ORDER that the Birkshire Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 50 ) is GRANTED; and that the DSS Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 51 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 5 ) is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/22/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via certified and regular mail). (sal )
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
11
DECISION and ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Peebles Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 7) is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in its entirety; and it is further ORDERED that all claims asserted against Broome County Defendant Department of Social Services (DSS) are DISMISSED, and the Clerk of Court shall terminate DSS from this action; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Fifth Amendment claim asserted against all Defendant s is DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Fourth and Fourteenth Amendment claims survive the Courts sua sponte review of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, and the Clerk of Court shall issue Summonses and forward them, along with copies of the Amended Complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service upon Defendants John Tkach, Ticia Eaves, Traci Ziegenhagen, Katrina Tokos, Julia Hepworth, Jessica Layman, Susan Patterson, Marissa Carter, Kathleen Santoni, John Choynowski, Jon Peterson, and Berkshire Farm Center, who are directed to respond in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on August 30, 2017. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(khr)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
6
DECISION AND ORDER accepting and adopting # 4 Magistrate Judge Peebles' Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Tkach and Eaves in his original Complaint are deemed to be formally defective and in need of correction through an Amended Complaint or they will be DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Pines and Lanouette in his original Complaint are deemed to be substantively defective and not capable of reassertion. The Cle rk of the Court shall amend the docket so as to TERMINATE Spero Pines and Ronald Lanouette as Defendants in this action, but to ADD as Defendants the additional entities and individuals identified in the Amended Complaint (i.e., the Broome County Dep artment of Social Services, Traci Ziegenhagen, Katrina Tokos, Julia Hepworth, Jessica Layman, Susan Patterson, Marissa Carter, Kathleen Santoni, John Choynowski, Jon Peterson, and Berskshire Farm Center). Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 5 ) is returned to Magistrate Judge Peebles for his review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 6/16/17. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?