Newman v. Hoyt et al
Plaintiff: |
John Newman |
Defendant: |
Rick Hoyt and Scott Cook |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00808 |
Filed: |
July 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Binghamton Office |
County: |
Broome |
Presiding Judge: |
David E. Peebles |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas J. McAvoy |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 8, 2018 |
Filing
64
DECISION & ORDER: The Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint in case No. 17cv1123, dkt. # 44 in case No. 17cv808, is hereby GRANTED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE both the lead and member cases. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 11/8/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified mail on 11/9/2018)(meb)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing
57
DECISION AND ORDER: Granting the # 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Because the Court finds that Plaintiff could not allege facts whichwould give him a right to relief, and because he has filed an Amended Complaint, the motion will be granted with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 8/6/2018. (Copy served on pro se plaintiff via regular mail)(meb)
|
October 23, 2017 |
Filing
9
DECISION & ORDER: Adopting the # 6 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's damage claims against defendants Hoyt and Cook in their official capacities, and his request for injunctive relief against the New York State Departm ent of Corrections and Community Supervision, are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs complaint is otherwise be accepted for filing, with leave to replead only with regard to the damage claims asserted against defendants Hoyt and Cook in their individual capacities. Plaintiffs Motion to Replead and/or Amend, # 7 , is referred to Magistrate Judge Peebles. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 10/20/2017. (Copy served upon the Pro Se plaintiff via regular mail)(meb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?