Brennan v. Village of Endicott, New York

Plaintiff: Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan
Defendant: Village of Endicott, New York
Case Number: 3:2018cv01474
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: David E Peebles
1 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter/NOTICE dated 2/1/2019 by Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan. (see)
January 7, 2019 Mailed copies of the #8 Decision & Order and #10 GO25 to Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan on 1/7/2019 by regular mail. Packet containing a certified copy of the #8 Decision & Order, #9 Summons, #10 GO25, #1 Complaint, and USM-285 form mailed to the USMS for service upon defts on 1/7/2019. (see)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/12/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
January 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Village of Endicott, New York. (see)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION & ORDER that pltf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED, and his #4 Letter Request to seal the complaint is DENIED as moot; Pltf's complaint is accepted for filing without prejudice to the right for deft Village of Endicott, New York to move for its dismissal and/or for the entry of summary judgment dismissing pltf's complaint; the Clerk if of the Court is respectfully directed to issue a summons and forward it with a copy of the complaint to the U.S. Marshal, along with packets containing GO25 for service upon deft; and the Clerk is respectfully directed to schedule a Rule 16 conference in the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 1/7/2019. (Copy served upon Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan via regular mail on 1/7/2019)(see)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE returned executed as to Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan. (see)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER BRIEF in response to the 5 Text Order by Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan. (see)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER : The court is in receipt of plaintiff's #4 Letter Motion requesting that the complaint be sealed pending a decision on plaintiff's application for in forma pauperis status. Plaintiff is directed to file a letter, on or before 1/2/2019, providing a specific basis as to why plaintiff's complaint should remain sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 12/21/2018. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan on 12/21/2018. {Notice only sent via regular mail without enclosures because pltf received them in the initial mailing} (see)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Letter Motion requesting that the complaint be sealed pending a decision is rendered on plaintiff's application for in forma pauperis status filed by Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan submitted to Judge Peebles. (sal)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (see)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Village of Endicott, New York filed by Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #2 Copy of mailing envelope)(see) Modified on 1/7/2019, document unsealed pursuant to the #8 Decision & Order. (see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan v. Village of Endicott, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Endicott, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Joseph Gabriel Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?