Haight v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Plaintiff: Erin Haight
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00371
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (rep)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: As to counselors Daniel K. Bryson and Harper T. Segui. Phone number is 919-600-5000. Email addresses are: dan@wbmllp.com and harper@wbmllp.com. Admissions are due by 4/11/2019. {Admission notices were sent via email to the attorneys listed}.(rep)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: As to counselors Hassan A. Zavareei and Andrea Gold - Phone number is (202) 973-0900. Email addresses are: hzavareei@tzlegal.com and agold@tzlegal.com. Admissions are due by 4/11/2019. {Admission notices were sent via email to the attorneys listed} (rep) Modified on 3/29/2019 - to note service method (rep).
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: As to counselors Gregory F. Coleman, Lisa F. White, Adam A. Edwards, and Rachel Soffin - Telephone number is: 865-247-0080. Email addresses are: greg@gregcolemanlaw.com, rachel@gregcolemanlaw.com, lisa@gregcolemanlaw.com, and adam@gregcolemanlaw.com. Admissions are due by 4/11/2019. {Admission notices were sent via email to the attorneys listed}.(rep)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 7/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/28/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sharp Electronics Corporation. (rep)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Sharp Electronics Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4693771), filed by Erin Haight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haight v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Haight
Represented By: Jonathan K. Tycko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?