DiGregorio et al v. Kellogg Sales Company
Plaintiff: Nafeesha Madyun, Kerry Austin, Melody DiGregorio and Eric Fishon
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00632
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: approving the #9 Stipulation. The time for defendant Kellogg Sales Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 7/30/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/28/2019. (nmk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading (Joint) by Kellogg Sales Company submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Panos, Dean)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean N. Panos on behalf of Kellogg Sales Company (Panos, Dean)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Dean N. Panos is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Kellogg Sales Company. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/25/2019. (nmk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dean N. Panos as Counsel for Kellogg Sales Company Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4778673. filed by Kellogg Sales Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #4 E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Oath on Admission, #6 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Edmondson, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Edmondson on behalf of Kellogg Sales Company (Edmondson, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melody DiGregorio, Eric Fishon, Nafeesha Madyun, Kerry Austin. Kellogg Sales Company served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Fitzgerald, John)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/20/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kellogg Sales Company. (hmr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kellogg Sales Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4754111) filed by Melody DiGregorio, Eric Fishon, Nafeesha Madyun, Kerry Austin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiGregorio et al v. Kellogg Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nafeesha Madyun
Represented By: John J. Fitzgerald, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Austin
Represented By: John J. Fitzgerald, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody DiGregorio
Represented By: John J. Fitzgerald, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fishon
Represented By: John J. Fitzgerald, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Sales Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Edmondson
Represented By: Dean N. Panos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?