Wozniak et al v. Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steve Wozniak and Deborah K. Wozniak
Defendant: Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows, LLC and Marvin Windows of New York, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00934
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT (Dunton) by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric Lilly on Behalf of Defendant Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company Regarding Dunton Status, #2 Affidavit of Eric Lilly on Behalf of Defendant Marvin Windows, LLC Regarding Dunton Status, #3 Affidavit of Eric Lilly on Behalf of Defendant Marvin Windows of New York, LLC Regarding Dunton Status)(Obermueller, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Deborah K. Wozniak, Steve Wozniak. (Pope, Alan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/9/2019. (jdp )
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael E. Obermueller Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4861624. filed by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Siegel, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 10/2/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/4/2019. (jdp )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Binghamton. Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019. Discovery due by 6/26/2020. Motions to be filed by 8/3/2020. Status Report due by 11/13/2019. Dunton Status Letter due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/4/2019. (jdp )
September 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/4/2019. APP: A. Pope, Esq. for the Pltf and M. Hawrylchak, Esq. for the Deft; Mandatory-Mediation to be completed by 12/18/2019; Pretrial deadlines are discussed and set; Pretrial Order to be issued. Status Report due by 11/13/2019; Dunton Status Letter due by 9/27/2019; Telephone Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to contact Chambers, which can be reached at 607-779-2628. (jdp )
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Hawrylchak, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Pope on behalf of Deborah K. Wozniak, Steve Wozniak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Correspondence to John Domurad)(Pope, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer served on Veroniza N. Ramirez, Esq. on 8/12/2019, filed by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Siegel, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Jeffrey Siegel, re #8 Answer to Complaint. Please electronically file proof of service of the above document on pltfs' counsel who is not yet admitted to practice in the NDNY. (see)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER BRIEF Statement for Cases Removed from State Court by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Siegel, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC.(Siegel, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Filing Order, Notice of Removal with Exhibits, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement of Defendants served on Veronica N. Ramirez, Esq. on 8/2/2019, filed by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, Inc., Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC. (Siegel, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. {Mailed to Attorney Ramirez on 8/1/2019 by regular mail} (see)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiffs; Attorney Veronica N. Ramirez. Phone number is 607-723-9511. Admissions due by 8/15/2019. {Admission letter mailed to Attorney on 8/1/2019 along with a copy of GO25 by regular mail}(see)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/28/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC, Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC: identifying Corporate Parent Marvin Windows, LLC for Marvin Windows of New York, LLC; Corporate Parent Marvin Companies, Inc. for Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC for Marvin Windows, LLC. (see)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Broome County, case number EFCA2019001982 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4817102) filed by Marvin Windows of New York, LLC, Marvin Windows, LLC, and Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Certificate of Merger, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wozniak et al v. Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Siegel
Represented By: Michael Y. Hawrylchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Windows of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Windows, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Siegel
Represented By: Michael Y. Hawrylchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Windows of New York, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Siegel
Represented By: Michael Y. Hawrylchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wozniak
Represented By: Alan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah K. Wozniak
Represented By: Alan J. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?