I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund et al v. Linkin Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund, Local Union No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Cooperative Trust, Ithaca Electrical Joint Educational and Training Trust Fund, Local No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, I.B.E.W. Local No. 241 Annuity Fund and I.B.E.W. Local 241 Welfare Benefits Fund
Defendant: Jeremy Butler and Linkin Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01043
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Linkin Systems, LLC & Jeremy Butler ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeremy Butler.(Lama, Luciano)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendant's Jeremy Butler and Linkin Systems, LLC Answer due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/7/2019. (jdp )
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Luciano L. Lama on behalf of All Defendants (Lama, Luciano)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Directing Defendant's counsel, Luciano L. Lama, Esq. to submit a Notice of Appearance. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/23/2019. (jdp )
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed,, by I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. Local 241 Welfare Benefits Fund, I.B.E.W. Local No. 241 Annuity Fund, Ithaca Electrical Joint Educational and Training Trust Fund, Local No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Cooperative Trust submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Kornfeld, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, I.B.E.W. Local 241 Welfare Benefits Fund, Ithaca Electrical Joint Educational and Training Trust Fund, Local Union No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Cooperative Trust, I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. Local No. 241 Annuity Fund. Jeremy Butler served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Linkin Systems, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Individual Summons Returned Executed)(Kornfeld, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 11:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/13/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Linkin Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Jeremy Butler)(khr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Butler, Linkin Systems, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4847355) filed by Local No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, I.B.E.W. Local 241 Welfare Benefits Fund, Ithaca Electrical Joint Educational and Training Trust Fund, Local Union No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Cooperative Trust, I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund, I.B.E.W. Local No. 241 Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund et al v. Linkin Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local 241 Pension Fund
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Employers Cooperative Trust
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ithaca Electrical Joint Educational and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local No. 241 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local No. 241 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Local 241 Welfare Benefits Fund
Represented By: Daniel E. Kornfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Butler
Represented By: Luciano L. Lama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkin Systems, LLC
Represented By: Luciano L. Lama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?