Barber v. Steuben County
Plaintiff: Tracy Barber
Defendant: Steuben County
Case Number: 3:2019cv01067
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 6:19-cv-06640, filed 08/30/2019. (amt)
August 29, 2019 Case transferred electronically to Western District of New York pursuant to Order of Transfer dated August 28, 2019. (jel, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - That the Clerk of the Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(a) of the Northern District of New York. That the Clerk of this Court advise the clerk of the Western District of New York of the entry of this order and provide all information necessary for the clerk of the Western District to electronically access the documents filed in this action, The Court hereby waives the fourteen (140 day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/27/2019. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(jel, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by Tracy Barber. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (jel, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tracy Barber. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (jel, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steuben County filed by Tracy Barber. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Steuben County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steuben County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?