Wood v. The Hartford
Plaintiff: Deborah Wood
Defendant: The Hartford
Case Number: 3:2019cv01347
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Hartford re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Clerk's Correction of Docket Entry, (Wagner, Mark)
December 18, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Per Attorney Wagner's request, Exhibits A and B to Docket #14 Response in Opposition to Motion have been replaced with the corrected exhibits. Counsel advises that his office has served opposing side with copies of the corrected exhibits. (lmw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Hartford re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Wagner, Mark)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Change Venue and Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark J. Wagner, Jr., in Opposition to Motion to Remand and in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Remand and in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Appendix : Unpublished Cases)(Wagner, Mark) Modified on 12/18/2019: Pursuant to Attorney's request, Exhibit A and Exhibit B were replaced with corrected exhibits. Counsel served corrected exhibits on opposing counsel. (lmw)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #12 is GRANTED ONLY to the extent and regarding Plaintiffs request for adjournment and re-scheduling of the In Person rule 16 conference currently scheduled for tomorrow, 12/18/2019. Therefore, the In Person Rule 16 conference is hereby adjourned and re-scheduled to 1/8/2020 at 1:00 PM at the U.S. Courthouse at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/1/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Personal appearances at the rule 16 conference are required. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks to change the motion schedule and motion deadlines as to motion #11 which is pending before District Court Judge Brenda K. Sannes, Plaintiff is directed to make that request to the District Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/17/2019. (Copy served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail)(jdp )
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion filed by Deborah Wood requesting Adjournment of the Rule 16 submitted to Judge Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. (jdp )
December 5, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's #11 Motion: Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019; any Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/26/2019. Plaintiff's motion will be heard on submission of the papers (served on Plaintiff via regular mail). (rjb, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Deborah Wood. (Attachments: #1 Letter re Civil Case Management Plan, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (dpk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Letter Motion #9 is DENIED as MOOT. The rule 16 In Person conference is actually scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM at the Federal Building 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY (not 12/2/2019). See Docket No. 5. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/13/2019. (Copy served on Pro Se Plaintiff with a copy of the docket via regular mail)(jdp )
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion by Deborah Wood requesting adjournment of the Rule 16 conference submitted to Judge Lovric. (dpk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Hartford re #7 Answer to Complaint (Wagner, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Hartford Exhaustion Letter, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wagner, Mark)
November 5, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #6 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE. Clerk inadvertently did not attach the document. Clerk uploaded the document to the docket entry. (kmp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Deborah Wood, Pro Se via regular mail.(kmp) Modified on 11/5/2019 to add document. (kmp)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 10:00 AM has BEEN RESCHEDULED to 12/18/2019 at 11:00 AM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (Copy served on Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail.) (jdp )
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Hartford re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order,, #1 Notice of Removal, (Wagner, Mark)
November 1, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for The Hartford answer due 11/7/2019. (dpk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Judge Lovric only holds Rule 16 Initial Conferences IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases with no exceptions. Requests to appear by way of telephone conference at the Rule 16 Initial Conference will be denied. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/25/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by The Hartford. (dpk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Chenango, case number 2019X336 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4927889) filed by The Hartford.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. The Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Mark J. Wagner, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A Troisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?