Bayait v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Bayait
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv01365
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE deeming this case related to Doran v. CR Bard Incorporated, et al., Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) under Section G.2. of General Order 12, because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources if the cases are assigned to the same district judge and magistrate judge. Additionally, Civil Action No. 5:19-CV-1126 (GTS/ML) shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case" and assigned to the undersigned, Chief U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and U.S. Magistrate Judge Miro Lovric. All future filings must be filed in the Lead Action ONLY, 5:19-cv-1126 (GTS/ML). SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/11/2019. (sal )
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 11:00 AM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The Parties/Counsel are directed to, no later than 1/6/2020, review the NDNY docket in this case and to also confer with the clerk's office to make certain that all documents, pleadings, court orders, court decisions, and other pertinent filings from the MDL district (District of Arizona) are properly docketed, included, or referenced on the NDNY docket. It is the responsibility of counsel to make certain that pertinent docket entries from the MDL district have been carried over or referenced in the NDNY docket. Counsel should notify the court clerk if any additional docket entries from the MDL district need to be added to this docket or referenced in this docket. Counsel are directed to coordinate with the court clerk to accomplish and complete this no later than 1/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2019. (jdp )
November 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 2:30 PM has been RESCHEDULED for 3/4/2020 at 11:00 AM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. ( Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)) (jdp )
November 20, 2019 Reset Initial Rule 16 Conference: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 2:00 PM has been RESCHEDULED for 2/5/2020 at 2:30 PM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/29/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Rogers, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/13/2019. (jdp, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4939833. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn in Support, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Scarpello, Tracey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J Baughman on behalf of Bonnie Bayait (Baughman, Laura)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated 11/6/2019 from Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., advising he will not be representing defts in this case. (re #7 Notice of Admission Requirement). Appearances will be made by Nixon Peabody LLP and another attorney who will be filing a motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (plp)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/29/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (plp) [served via e-mail on 11/5/2019 to e-mail addresses listed in entries 5, 6 and 7] (plp)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 11/19/2019. (plp) [served via e-mail on 11/5/2019 to e-mail addresses listed in entries 5, 6 and 7] (plp)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Paul Lincoln Stoller, Esq., Email address is Paul@drlawllp.com. Phone number is 602-888-2807. Admissions due by 11/19/2019. (plp) [served via e-mail on 11/5/2019 to e-mail addresses listed in entries 5, 6 and 7] (plp).
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney John A. Dalimonte, Esq., Email address is john@drlawllp.com. Phone number is 617-367-3311. Admissions due by 11/19/2019. (plp) [served via e-mail on 11/5/2019 to e-mail addresses listed in entries 5, 6 and 7] (plp).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00193. electronically transferred when case opened
October 22, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00193-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/5/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16400227 filed by Bonnie Bayait. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayait v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Bayait
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?