Faughnan et al v. AMAG, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa Faughnan and Jennifer Maltese
Defendant: AMAG, Inc. and Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01394
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/6/2020. (jdp )
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint to January 31, 2020 by Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. submitted to Judge Lovric. (Barrer, Robert)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Barrer on behalf of Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Barrer, Robert)
January 2, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer due 1/13/2020. (see)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT received as to Teresa Faughnan, Jennifer Maltese served on AMAG Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Paul, Richard)
December 20, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: #1 Complaint replaced to reflect the correct name of the Defendant per 10 Text Order. (jdp )
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (jdp )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: On 11/12/2019 Plaintiff filed a complaint #1 which correctly spelled and identified Defendants name as Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in the body of the complaint but in error referred and identified Defendant in the caption of the complaint as Amag, Inc. Based on this error by Plaintiff, the clerk issued the summons #2 in the name of Amag, Inc. as reflected in the complaint caption. Plaintiff has now filed Letter Motion #9 to correct this mistake. The Court GRANTS Letter Motion #9 and directs the clerk to correct the caption of the complaint to reflect defendant as identified in the body, that being, Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; correct the docket to reflect the same corrected name; and to issue a new summons reflecting defendants name as Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/17/2019. (jdp )
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Paul LLP for Teresa Faughnan, Jennifer Maltese . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Paul, Richard)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/6/2019. (jdp, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard M. Paul III Filing fee $100, receipt number BNYNDC-4961595. filed by Teresa Faughnan, Jennifer Maltese. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission to Practice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form and Oath on Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #5 is GRANTED. The admission paperwork for Pro Hac Vice Motion admission shall be filed no later than 12/13/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2019. (jdp )
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Rick Paul for Teresa Faughnan, Jennifer Maltese requesting an Extension of time to File Pro Hac Vice Motion submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiffs; Attorneys Richard M. Paul, III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, and Sean Cooper Email addresses are Rick@PaulLLP.com, Ashlea@PaulLLP.com, and Sean@PaulLLP.com. Phone number is (816) 984-8100. Admissions due by 11/27/2019. {Notice mailed to all the above attorneys on 11/13/2019 by regular mail}(see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 11:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/5/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMAG, Inc. (see)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AMAG, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4940306) filed by Jennifer Maltese and Teresa Faughnan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faughnan et al v. AMAG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amag Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Barrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Faughnan
Represented By: Chantal Khalil
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: Richard Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Maltese
Represented By: Chantal Khalil
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: Richard Paul, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?