Potts v. Potts
Plaintiff: Shannon R. Potts
Defendant: Blyden Potts
Case Number: 3:2019cv01403
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Blyden Potts answer due 1/24/2020. (sfp, )
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Blyden Potts on 01/03/2020, filed by Shannon R. Potts. (Miller, Deborah)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Defendant contacted the Clerk's Office (Albany) regarding service of summons and complaint but did not receive a copy of the General Order #25. Courtesy copy of General Order #25 was mailed to the defendant at the address indicated on the summons. (dpk)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/12/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Blyden Potts. (sfp, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Blyden Potts (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4941829) filed by Shannon R. Potts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon R. Potts
Represented By: Deborah Wolf Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blyden Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?