Eggleston et al v. City of Binghamton et al
Plaintiff: David Eggleston and William Yeager
Defendant: Clarence E. Shager, Jr., City of Binghamton and Chuck
Case Number: 3:2020cv00056
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants, City of Binghamton and Clarence E. Shager, JR., Answer is now due by March 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/13/2020. (jdp )
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by City of Binghamton, Clarence E. Shager, Jr. submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Billok, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Request. City of Binghamton and Clarence E. Shager, Jr. answer due 3/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/13/2020. (jdp )
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Michael D. Billok for City of Binghamton, Clarence E. Shager, Jr. requesting extension of time to Answer submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Billok, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Billok on behalf of City of Binghamton, Clarence E. Shager, Jr. (Billok, Michael)
February 4, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for City of Binghamton answer due 2/18/2020 and Clarence E. Shager, Jr. answer due 2/18/2020. (pjh)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Jury Trial Demanded Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice served on Clarence Shager, Jr. on January 27, 2020, filed by David Eggleston. (Lanouette, Dawn)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Jury Trial Demanded Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice served on City of Binghamton on January 27, 2020, filed by David Eggleston. (Lanouette, Dawn)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/22/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Binghamton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Clarence E. Shager, Jr.)(pjh)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against City of Binghamton and Clarence E. Shager, Jr. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5000636) filed by David Eggleston and William Yeager. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggleston et al v. City of Binghamton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence E. Shager, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Binghamton
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck
Represented By: Michael D. Billok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eggleston
Represented By: Dawn J. Lanouette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Yeager
Represented By: Dawn J. Lanouette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?