E. F. v. The Roman Catholic Diocese of Syracuse, NY et al
Plaintiff: E. F.
Defendant: Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc., St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church School, The Roman Catholic Diocese of Syracuse, NY, St. Francis of Assisi Roman Catholic Church and St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church
Case Number: 3:2020cv00212
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket. The 5/11/2020 telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. Defendant counsel to file status report on the Bankruptcy by 5/26/2020. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2020. (sg )
April 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. of Entry of Consent Order and Granting the BSA's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Order)(Kenny, Mike)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mike Kenny on behalf of Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. (Kenny, Mike)
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. OF COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE BSA (Miller, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed Defendants Susquenango Council, Inc.'s and Baden-Powell Council, Inc.'s letter request (Dkt. No. #18 ) for extension of time to respond to the complaint which is granted. Said defendant's time to respond to the complaint is adjourned without new date at this time. However, said defendant shall file a status report by 4/3/2020 regarding the Delaware Bankruptcy Court proceeding. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/13/2020. (sg )
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by E. F. re #7 Notice of Admission Requirement, #6 Notice of Admission Requirement (Breit, Mitchell)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 First Letter Motion from Michael L. Kenny Jr. for Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. requesting Extension of Time to File Answer submitted to Judge Therese W. Dancks . (Miller, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America, Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement,, (Miller, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William H. Gordon, Esq. for E.F. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/11/2020. (sg )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell Garabedian, Esq. for E.F. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/11/2020. (sg )
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by E. F. re: Plaintiff's Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9027 Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Breit, Mitchell)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 Supplemental Admission documents re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,,. (Attachments: #1 Attorney E-Filing Registration)(Breit, Mitchell)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Attorney E-FIling Registration)(Breit, Mitchell)
March 9, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William H. Gordon. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: new signed and dated Attorney Registration Form, new Petition for Admission to Practice in the form published by the Court 12/2019; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
March 9, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell Garbedian. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: new signed and dated Attorney Registration Form, new Petition for Admission to Practice in the form published by the Court 12/2019; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of William H. Gordon Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5053712. filed by E. F.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor Mitchell M. Breit, #2 Declaration Verified Petition for Admission of William H. Gordon, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order for Admission of William H. Gordon, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Breit, Mitchell)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell Garabedian Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5053707. filed by E. F.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor Mitchell M. Breit, #2 Declaration Verified Petition for Admission of Mitchell Garabedian, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order for Admission of Mitchell Garabedian Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Breit, Mitchell)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell M. Breit on behalf of E. F. (Breit, Mitchell)
February 28, 2020 Clerk mailed a copy of the Dkt. No. #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order to Attorney Glasser, Attorney Smith, Attorney Kenny, Attorney Hanly, Attorney Conroy, Attorney Bierstein, Attorney Garabedian, and Attorney Gordon via regular mail on 2/28/2020. (hmr)
February 28, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #7 Notice of Admission Requirement: Clerk removed "emailed" and added "mailed" to this docket entry. (hmr)
February 27, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America answer due 3/3/2020; Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. answer due 3/3/2020. (hmr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Mitchell Garabedian, Email address is mgarabedian@garabedianlaw.com. Phone number is (617) 523-6250. Attorney William H. Gordon, Email address is wgordon@garabedianlaw.com. Phone number is (617) 523-6250. Admissions due by 3/12/2020. [Copy mailed to Attorney Garabedian and Attorney Gordon via regular mail on 2/27/2020.](hmr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Jayne Conroy, Email address is jconroy@simmonsfirm.com. Phone number is (212) 784-6401 and Attorney Andrea Bierstein, Email address is abierstein@simmonsfirm.com. Phone number is (212) 784-6401. Admissions due by 3/12/2020. [Copy mailed to Attorney Conroy and Attorney Bierstein via regular mail on 2/27/2020.] (hmr) Modified on 2/28/2020 (hmr).
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Paul J. Hanly, Jr.,. Phone number is 212-784-6401. Admissions due by 3/11/2020. [Copy mailed to Attorney Hanly via regular mail on 2/26/2020.](hmr)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendants Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc. and Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America; Attorney James L. Glasser, Email address is jglasser@wiggin.com. Phone number is 212-551-2600. Attorney Kevin M. Smith, Email address is ksmith@wiggin.com. Phone number is 212-551-2600. Attorney Michael Kenny, Jr., Email address is mkenny@wiggin.com. Phone number is 212-551-2600. [Copy mailed to Attorney Glasser, Attorney Smith, and Attorney Kenny via regular mail on 2/26/2020.] Admissions due by 3/11/2020. (hmr)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER filed by St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church, St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church School, St. Francis of Assisi Roman Catholic Church, The Roman Catholic Diocese of Syracuse, NY. (hmr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (hmr)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Broome County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019003404 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5040710) filed by Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc., Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. F. v. The Roman Catholic Diocese of Syracuse, NY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baden-Powell Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Michael Leonard Miller
Represented By: Mike Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susquenango Council, Boy Scouts of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Leonard Miller
Represented By: Mike Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church School
Represented By: Lorraine M. Mertell
Represented By: Stephen T. Helmer
Represented By: Dean J. DiPilato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Syracuse, NY
Represented By: Lorraine M. Mertell
Represented By: Stephen T. Helmer
Represented By: Dean J. DiPilato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis of Assisi Roman Catholic Church
Represented By: Lorraine M. Mertell
Represented By: Stephen T. Helmer
Represented By: Dean J. DiPilato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Catherine's Roman Catholic Church
Represented By: Lorraine M. Mertell
Represented By: Stephen T. Helmer
Represented By: Dean J. DiPilato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. F.
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?